This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2021 at 20:56:20 (UTC).

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION VS 726 S COLUMBIA STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90017

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against 726 S COLUMBIA STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90017. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3098

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

Respondent

726 S COLUMBIA STREET LOS ANGELES CA 90017

Not Classified By Court

BLANCO RONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MIKA BRANDON

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ABDELJAWAD EYAD

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

9/17/2021: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE, NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 2924J(C) & (D)

9/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE, NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 2924J(C) & (D)

Notice of Status Conference and Order

9/27/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MANUEL BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM BY THE ESTATE FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS

11/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MANUEL BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM BY THE ESTATE FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LILIAN BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM BY THE ESTATE FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS

11/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LILIAN BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM BY THE ESTATE FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CARLOS BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM BY THE ESTATE FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS

11/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CARLOS BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM BY THE ESTATE FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS

11/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS

Notice - NOTICE OF CLAIM; CLAIM FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS

11/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CLAIM; CLAIM FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS

Answer

11/5/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

11/5/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

10/26/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • Hearing11/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MANUEL BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM BY THE ESTATE FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS); Filed by Ronald Blanco (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ronald Blanco (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF LILIAN BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM BY THE ESTATE FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS); Filed by Ronald Blanco (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Ronald Blanco (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF RONALD BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS); Filed by Ronald Blanco (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF CARLOS BLANCO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM BY THE ESTATE FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SURPLUS FUNDS); Filed by Ronald Blanco (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CLAIM; CLAIM FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLUS); Filed by Ronald Blanco (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Certificate of Service); Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Petition of Trustee, National Default Servicing Corporation to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Civil Code 2924j(c) & (d)); Filed by National Default Servicing Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABDELJAWAD EYAD YASER