This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 19:30:05 (UTC).

NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SIGNATURE BUILDER INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against SIGNATURE BUILDER INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0196

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PRIMIOR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SIGNATURE BUILDER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ZHOU LI

TU HONGGUANG

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SIGNATURE BUILDER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASE BRIAN S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEBOVIC IRA

VON ESCH IV ROBERT A

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/2/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/5/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/5/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/5/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DECLARATION OF JULIO E. SOTO-KIM

4/5/2022: Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DECLARATION OF JULIO E. SOTO-KIM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ANSWER SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN...)

4/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ANSWER SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND PROPOSED ORDER

4/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND PROPOSED ORDER

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/8/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/8/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE MATTER SHOULD NOT PROCEED TO ...) OF 02/08/2022

2/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE MATTER SHOULD NOT PROCEED TO ...) OF 02/08/2022

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/8/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/8/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/8/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/8/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE MATTER SHOULD NOT PROCEED TO ...)

2/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE MATTER SHOULD NOT PROCEED TO ...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF THE FOLLOWING:RULING AT CASE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY

2/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF THE FOLLOWING:RULING AT CASE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY

Notice of Continuance

12/27/2021: Notice of Continuance

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • Hearing09/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Hearing08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND PROPOSED ORDER); Filed by HONGGUANG TU (Defendant); LI ZHOU (Defendant); PRIMIOR INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why The Answer Should Not Be Stricken for Defendant Primior Inc.'s Failures to Appear at the 12/10/2021 and 02/08/2022 Hearings) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why The Answer Should Not Be Stricken...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketResponse (RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DECLARATION OF JULIO E. SOTO-KIM); Filed by HONGGUANG TU (Defendant); LI ZHOU (Defendant); PRIMIOR INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF THE FOLLOWING:RULING AT CASE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY); Filed by NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIGNATURE BUILDER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIMIOR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION AND REMEDIATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VON ESCH IV ROBERT A