This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 13:51:17 (UTC).

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC VS NEW YORK MART EL MONTE I

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NEW YORK MART EL MONTE I. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7822

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC.

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES

Respondents, Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DENG LONG

NEW YORK MART EL MONTE INC.

WU MYINT KYAW

WU JEFFREY

ZHANG MING ZHE

DOES 1 - 10

KYAW MYINT J.

SUPER HK OF EL MONTE INC.

ZHANG MING

ZHANG MINGZHE

IFRESH MARKET

WU JEFFREY MYINT

KYAW MYINT

NEW YORK MART EL MONTE INC. DBA IFRESH MARKET

KYAW MYINT AKA MYINT J. KYAW AKA MYINT KYAW WU AKA JEFFREY MYINT WU AKA JEFFREY WU

ZHANG MING ZHE AKA MINGZHE ZHANG AKA MING ZHANG

BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BESNYL GLENN A. ESQ.

BESNYL GLENN ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

PROOS ERIC J.

EGHBALI DORON

CHONG ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Judgment

8/27/2021: Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

8/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKE ANSWER OF MING ZHE ZHANG FOR F...)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKE ANSWER OF MING ZHE ZHANG FOR F...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER STRIKING ANSWER AND ENTERING DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT MING ZHE ZHANG

7/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER STRIKING ANSWER AND ENTERING DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT MING ZHE ZHANG

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/5/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

8/5/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees

Request for Dismissal

8/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PETER CHHEOU

8/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PETER CHHEOU

Declaration - DECLARATION CASE SUMMARY

8/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION CASE SUMMARY

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT

8/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RON SMITH

8/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RON SMITH

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

8/5/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: STRIKING THE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MING ZHE ZHANG FOR HIS FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE STATUS CONFERENCE ON 07/09/21

7/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: STRIKING THE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MING ZHE ZHANG FOR HIS FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE STATUS CONFERENCE ON 07/09/21

Notice - NOTICE (1) NOTICE OF VACATED TRIAL DATE (2) NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

7/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE (1) NOTICE OF VACATED TRIAL DATE (2) NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Order - ORDER ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT LONG DENG

7/9/2021: Order - ORDER ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT LONG DENG

Order - Dismissal

7/9/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LONG DENG

7/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LONG DENG

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Peter Chheou); Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration In Support of Entry of Judgment By Court After Default); Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Ron Smith); Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Case Summary); Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC717822    Hearing Date: February 02, 2021    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: February 2, 2021

Case Name: National Commercial Recovery, Inc. v. NY Mart El Monte, et al.

Case No.: BC717822

Motion: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Moving Party: Doron F. Eghbali, counsel for Ming Zhang

Responding Party: Unopposed


Tentative Ruling: The Motion is denied without prejudice.


Doron F. Eghbali seeks to be relieved as counsel for Ming Zhang. The Motion is denied without prejudice because counsel failed to provide the information required by item 3(b) on Form MC-052. Further, the proposed order on Form MC-053 is not completely filled out.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPER HK OF EL MONTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW YORK MART EL MONTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA IFRESH MARKET is a litigant

Latest cases where BLAIR SMITH AND ASOCIATES is a litigant