This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2022 at 01:29:00 (UTC).

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC. VS MORENO GROUP INTERNATIONAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORENO GROUP INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7042

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES

Defendants

MORENO GROUP INTERNATIONAL DBA EL PICANTE

MORENO JORGE AKA JORGE H. MORENO AKA JORGE MORENO JR. AKA JORGE H. MORENO JR. AKA GEORGE MORENO AKA GEORGE H. MORENO JR. DBA EL PICANTE

MORENO VICTOR AKA VICTOR A. MORENO AKA VICTOR ALEJANDRO MORENO AKA VICTOR HERRERA DBA EL PICANTE

REYES MARIA AKA MARIA L. REYES AKA MARIA LOURDES REYES AKA MARIA DE LOURDES REYES AKA LOURDES REYES AKA LOURDES MARIA REYES AKA MARIA DE LA LUZ REYES AKA MARIA DELALUZ REYES DBA EL PICANTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BESNYL GLENN A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

2/15/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/19/2022

1/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/19/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

1/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

1/10/2022: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (For Conditional Settlement); Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 01/19/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BESNYL GLENN ALAN