This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 02:19:20 (UTC).

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS PAYAM SAEEDIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PAYAM SAEEDIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5925

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES

Defendants

SAEEDIAN PAYAM AKA PAYAM SAEIDIAN AKA JERRY SAEEDIAN AKA JERRY SAEIDIAN DBA NU CONSTRUCTION DBA P & S FASHION DBA P & S FASHION INC.

SAEEDIAN PARVIZ AKA PARVIZ SAEIDIAN AKA PAUL SAEEDIAN AKA PAUL SAEIDIAN DBA NU CONSTRUCTION DBA P & S FASHION DBA P & S FASHION INC.

Not Classified By Court

PAYAM SAEIDIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BESNYL GLENN ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDBERG ROBERT DAVID

CIRLIN JASON N.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/8/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

11/13/2019: Answer

Notice of Ruling

11/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...)

11/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION DATE 09/18/19 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 53

9/18/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION DATE 09/18/19 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 53

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: [1] STAY ENFORCEMENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; [2] SET-ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/26/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: [1] STAY ENFORCEMENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; [2] SET-ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - NOTICE OF MOTION

9/16/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - NOTICE OF MOTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO: [1] STAY ENFORCEMENT OF D...)

9/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO: [1] STAY ENFORCEMENT OF D...)

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

9/6/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

9/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

7/22/2019: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/22/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

7/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action;); Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Jury Trial ((3 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 4:38 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Jury Trial ((3 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by National Commercial Recovery, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BESNYL GLENN ALAN