Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 23:02:33 (UTC).

NATHANIEL CONRAD VS JUDY DIGEORGE

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 NATHANIEL CONRAD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JUDY DIGEORGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5977

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CONRAD NATHANIEL

CONRAD POOL & SPA INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CONRAD DIANE

CONRAD TERESA

CONRAD DAVID

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DIGEORGE JUDY

LOICANO BONNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HERRERA ALEJANDRO H. ESQ.

HERRERA ALEJANDRO H.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KEAVNEY RICHARD PATRICK

SEEMEN BART

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

12/1/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

10/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

10/6/2020: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/6/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

10/6/2020: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

9/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

9/30/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF NATHANIEL CONRADS OPPOSITION ISO OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT JUDY DIGEORGES DEMURRER

9/18/2020: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF NATHANIEL CONRADS OPPOSITION ISO OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT JUDY DIGEORGES DEMURRER

Cross-Complaint

7/28/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

8/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2/18/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/20/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/24/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • Hearing07/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Hearing07/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Hearing07/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Cross-Complainants Judy Digeorge and Bonnie Loicano;) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Complaint;) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docketat 11:42 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Judy Digeorge (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Judy Digeorge (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docketat 09:50 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/13/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Judy Digeorge (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nathaniel Conrad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERRERA ALEJANDRO H.