This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2022 at 04:12:56 (UTC).

NATHAN KOBE DAROUGAR VS RYAN KHODADADI

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 NATHAN KOBE DAROUGAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RYAN KHODADADI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0409

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAROUGAR NATHAN KOBE

Defendant

KHODADADI RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NAIM RYAN

SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/25/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/25/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/25/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/25/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/2/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by NATHAN KOBE DAROUGAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by NATHAN KOBE DAROUGAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NATHAN KOBE DAROUGAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NATHAN KOBE DAROUGAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NATHAN KOBE DAROUGAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAIM RYAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.