This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2022 at 02:00:01 (UTC).

NATHAN HARRIS, ET AL. VS DALIA GAMBOA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 NATHAN HARRIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DALIA GAMBOA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2025

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HARRIS NATHAN

PHENIX TRANSPORTATION INC.

PHENIX TRANSPORTATION WEST INC.

WILKERSON B. RICHARD

WILKERSON DAPHNE P.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GAMBOA DALIA

GONZALEZ SERGIO

HERNANDEZ JOSHUA

LOPEZ CARLOS

MONREAL JUAN

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GONZALEZ SERGIO

HARRIS NATHAN

LOPEZ CARLOS

MONREAL JUAN

PHENIX TRANSPORTATION INC.

PHENIX TRANSPORTATION WEST INC.

WILKERSON B. RICHARD

WILKERSON DAPHNE P.

CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLASS ZAKIYA N.

JENKINS MICHAEL E.

Defendant Attorney

ECHEVERRIA RICARDO

Cross Defendant Attorneys

FLORY MARK W.

GLASS ESQ ZAKIYA

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS-IN-INTERPLEADER NOTICE OF ERRATA

1/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS-IN-INTERPLEADER NOTICE OF ERRATA

Cross-Complaint

1/14/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

1/14/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

1/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Notice of Ruling

1/26/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

2/17/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSHUA

2/17/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSHUA

Answer

2/22/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

2/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSHUA

3/21/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSHUA

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/25/2022: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/1/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cherokee Insurance Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Dalia Gamboa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Daphne P. Wilkerson (Plaintiff); B. Richard Wilkerson (Plaintiff); Nathan Harris (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Cross-Defendants) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Dalia Gamboa (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Joshua); Filed by Dalia Gamboa (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nathan Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nathan Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by Daphne P. Wilkerson (Plaintiff); B. Richard Wilkerson (Plaintiff); Nathan Harris (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Nathan Harris (Plaintiff); Phenix Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff); Phenix Transportation West, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dalia Gamboa (Defendant); Joshua Hernandez (Defendant); Sergio Gonzalez (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nathan Harris (Plaintiff); Phenix Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff); Phenix Transportation West, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by Nathan Harris (Plaintiff); Phenix Transportation, Inc. (Plaintiff); Phenix Transportation West, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Phenix Transportation West Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cherokee Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASS ZAKIYA N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENKINS MICHAEL EDWIN