This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:05:12 (UTC).

NATHALIE LORENA DIAZ ET AL VS ROYAL GARDENS APTS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 NATHALIE LORENA DIAZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROYAL GARDENS APTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0873

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

DIAZ NATHALIE LORENA

PANIAGUA LEONARDO DE JESUS

Defendants and Respondents

ROYAL GARDEN APTS. INC

J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC

DOES 1 TO 50

Minors

DIAZ KEVAN JULIAN

DIAZ-TABORA NATHANIEL MAURICE

DIAZ-TABORA LORIE LORENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CASTELBLANCO ERIC E. ESQ.

MERE NATALIE D

CASTELBLANCO ERIC E.

RODAS CATALINA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CAMERON PARRY G. ESQ.

NORTON & MELNIK

NORTON GEOFFREY P.

LUNN HEATHER F.

OLSON SONALI

LEE CHRISTINE S.

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney

12/27/2018: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order

1/24/2019: Stipulation and Order

Ex Parte Application

2/1/2019: Ex Parte Application

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/16/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

4/29/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/26/2018: Minute Order

1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

4/2/2018: 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED HABITABILITY COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/2/2018: FIRST AMENDED HABITABILITY COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF AND )PPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S 1OTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF ELAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED DOMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM IN UPPORT THEROF

5/31/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF AND )PPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S 1OTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF ELAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED DOMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM IN UPPORT THEROF

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/6/2018: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

6/13/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/20/2018: DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

1/4/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

8/4/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

SUMMONS

9/20/2017: SUMMONS

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Order (Granting Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Los Angeles Dept of Water and Power); Filed by Royal Garden Apartments, Inc. Erroneously Sued As ROYAL GARDEN APTS. INC (Defendant); Royal Garden Apartments, Inc. Erroneously Sued As J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Royal Garden Apartments, Inc. Erroneously Sued As ROYAL GARDEN APTS. INC (Defendant); Royal Garden Apartments, Inc. Erroneously Sued As J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date and All Related Dates); Filed by Nathalie Lorena Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Motion to Quash Subpoena to Los Angeles Department of Water and Power) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date and All Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Motion to Quash Subpoena to Los Angeles Department of Water a...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Notice (PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL FILING IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS OF THE LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER; EXHIBIT A); Filed by Nathalie Lorena Diaz (Plaintiff); Leonardo De Jesus Paniagua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2017
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • HABITABILITY COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Nathalie Lorena Diaz (Plaintiff); Leonardo De Jesus Paniagua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC670873    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 51

The petitions to confirm minor's compromise for KevinJulian Diaz, Lorie Lorena Diaz-Tabora and Nathaniel Maurice Diaz-Tabora are granted. The minors need not appear at the hearing.