This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 02:01:59 (UTC).

NATALIE YERETZI VS HOME TLC INC

Case Summary

On 04/30/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by NATALIE YERETZI against HOME TLC INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4393

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OSORIO NATALIE YARETZI

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

THE HOME DEPOT INC.

HOME TLC INC.

Guardian Ad Litem

OSORIO KATHY

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

5/21/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

SUMMONS

6/21/2018: SUMMONS

Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust

6/24/2019: Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/30/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust; Filed by Kathy Osorio (Legacy Party); Natalie Yaretzi Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Kathy Osorio (Legacy Party); Natalie Yaretzi Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Natalie Yaretzi Osorio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704393    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 2

OSORIO v. HOME TLC

The court has considered Petitioner’s Second Supplemental List of Attachments in Support of Plaintiff’s Petition to Approve Compromise of Minor’s Claim and the invoices submitted. The court finds that the invoice for filing the complaint was included in the original cost calculation and is duplicative. The court grants and approves the petition and the following distribution.

* * *

Attorney’s fees (25%) $15,750.00

Medical expenses 3,042.79

Costs 1,829.15

Total fees and costs $20,621.94

* * *

Total Settlement $63,000.00

Less credits -20,621.94

Net Settlement $42,378.06

* * *

Petitioner is ordered to provide orders reflecting the foregoing distribution.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC704393    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 2

Osorio v. Home TLC

The Court has reviewed the Amended Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Minor, (Natalie Yaretzi Osorio, Age 8) filed on 10/28/2019. The Court finds that the settlement is reasonable. However, the Court finds that the Petition does not provide sufficient substantiation for the request for reimbursement of messenger fees in the amount of $1,374.90. Counsel is ordered to provide invoices substantiating these costs within 10 days.

Absent further evidence substantiating costs of $1,374.90 incurred for messenger fees, the Court intends to approve the following distribution:

Attorney’s fees (25%)

$15,750.00

Medical expenses

3,042.79

Costs

454.25

Total fees and costs

$19,247.04

Total Settlement

$63,000.00

Less credits

-19,247.04

Net Settlement

$43,752.96

The hearing is continued to 12/09/2019 at 8:30 p.m. in Department 2.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.