This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 19:28:33 (UTC).

NATALIE NGUYEN VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 NATALIE NGUYEN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0546

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUYEN NATALIE

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

6/17/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/14/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Natalie Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Natalie Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Natalie Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Natalie Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Natalie Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Natalie Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Natalie Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant