This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 03:43:56 (UTC).

NATALIE JOHNSON VS EAN HOLDINGS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 NATALIE JOHNSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EAN HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4560

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOHNSON NATALIE

Respondents and Defendants

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR COMPANY OF LOS

LU WHITNEY SHIEN WEN

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASHANI JACON KAHEN

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

SNYDER BARRY C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EAN HOLDINGS, LLC; ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/8/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EAN HOLDINGS, LLC; ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Minute Order

2/27/2018: Minute Order

Notice

2/28/2018: Notice

Answer

2/28/2018: Answer

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

3/20/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

8/9/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED MOTION DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

Notice of Change of Firm Name

10/19/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Stipulation and Order

1/7/2019: Stipulation and Order

Motion for Summary Judgment

1/29/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration

1/29/2019: Declaration

Declaration

1/29/2019: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

1/29/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/2/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice

4/12/2019: Notice

Minute Order

4/19/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/29/2019: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/22/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/22/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of No Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR COMPANY OF LOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NATALIE JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jameson Acos In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR COMPANY OF LOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR COMPANY OF LOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by NATALIE JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by NATALIE JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NATALIE JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4560    Hearing Date: November 19, 2019    Dept: 2

Johnson v. EAN Holdings, LLC, et al.

Motion by ACE American Insurance Company for Leave to Intervene filed on 10/15/19, is GRANTED.  Answer-In -Intervention to be filed within 10-days.

Intervention is proper where the intervenor shows an interest relating to the property or transaction which is the subject of the action and disposition of the action may as a practical matter impair or impede that person’s ability to protect the interest. Code Civ. Proc., ; 387(d)(1).

Intervenor has an interest in this litigation because, under the provisions of the Insurance Code, an action can be brought against the insurer in the event the Plaintiff obtains a judgment against the insured. Ins. Code, ; 11580

Intervention is permitted to allow the insurer to protect its interests in the litigation. Without the insured, ACE is not able to protect its interests. Western Heritage Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (2011) 199 Cal. App. 4th 1196, 1207-1208. ACE has no means other than intervention to litigate liability or damage issues. Reliance Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (2000) 84 Cal. App. 4th 383, 385.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASHANI JACOB KAHEN