This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2020 at 23:09:56 (UTC).

NATALIE DRILLINGS VS GLOBAL ALTERNATIVE ENERGY GROUP INC ET

Case Summary

On 05/09/2018 NATALIE DRILLINGS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GLOBAL ALTERNATIVE ENERGY GROUP INC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5603

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

DRILLINGS NATALIE

Respondents and Defendants

HANRAHAN SEAN PATRICK

GLOBAL ALTERNATIVE ENERGY GROUP INC.

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FREEDMAN ERIC

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

MILLER DELANEY L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY 1. NEGLIGENCE

5/9/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY 1. NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS -

5/9/2018: SUMMONS -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/9/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/18/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Other - - Demand for Jury Trial

6/15/2018: Other - - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer -

6/15/2018: Answer -

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/21/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/2/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/23/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

10/17/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice of Settlement

1/28/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEME...)

1/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEME...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEME...) OF 01/28/2020

1/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEME...) OF 01/28/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • Hearing04/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Conditional Settleme...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Conditional Settleme...) of 01/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Natalie Drillings (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Global Alternative Energy Group, Inc. (Defendant); Sean Patrick Hanrahan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only; Filed by Natalie Drillings (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Global Alternative Energy Group, Inc. (Defendant); Sean Patrick Hanrahan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Global Alternative Energy Group, Inc. (Defendant); Sean Patrick Hanrahan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Global Alternative Energy Group, Inc. (Defendant); Sean Patrick Hanrahan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Natalie Drillings (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Natalie Drillings (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY 1. NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less