This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:15:45 (UTC).

NASHAT M HABIB VS LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER & POWER, E

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 NASHAT M HABIB filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER POWER, E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7320

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HABIB NASHAT M

Defendants

EDWARDS MARCIE L

MONTAG ERIC

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER & POWER

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDSGAARD OLAF ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

FEUR MIKE N

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

8/21/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

8/21/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/21/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

8/21/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

8/21/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

Minute Order

12/20/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/24/2018: Minute Order

STATUS REPORT

1/24/2018: STATUS REPORT

Minute Order

2/15/2018: Minute Order

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE

2/15/2018: STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE

Minute Order

1/4/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

1/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

10/3/2017: NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Removal to Federal Court 2)...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Removal to Federal Court 2)...) of 01/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14; (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Plaintiff) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Not held-No appearances) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.