This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 04:14:57 (UTC).

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS BCH ENTERPRISES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against BCH ENTERPRISES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4076

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP

Respondents

BCH ENTERPRISES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BCH ENTERPRISES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

12/15/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

1/28/2022: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/11/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE CASE;) OF 05/09/2022

5/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE CASE;) OF 05/09/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE CASE;)

5/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE CASE;)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16, Lia Martin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Prosecute the Case;) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute the Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute the Case;) of 05/09/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (to Confirm Arbitration Award); Filed by Nasch Village Green LP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Nasch Village Green LP (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BCH ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.