This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2023 at 08:15:02 (UTC).

NARINE MKRTCHYAN VS KARAPET BABAYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 NARINE MKRTCHYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KARAPET BABAYAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JILL FEENEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2434

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MKRTCHYAN NARINE

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

PETROL MOBILE FUELING LOGISTICS INC.

WILLIAMS LILL LSG LLC

BABAYAN KARAPET

TERMENDZHYAN LEVON

WILLIAMS TANK LINES

NOIL USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVIN ELLEN ESQ.

MARTINIAN TIGRAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

REINHOLTZ JACK RUSSELL ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HUNTER TIFFANY BACI ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Witness List

2/1/2022: Witness List

Jury Instructions

2/1/2022: Jury Instructions

Exhibit List

2/1/2022: Exhibit List

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EXPERT WITNESSES, RETAINED, DUE TO FAILURE TO DESIGNATE EXPERTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 2034 ET SEQ.

2/1/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EXPERT WITNESSES, RETAINED, DUE TO FAILURE TO DESIGNATE EXPERTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 2034 ET SEQ.

Jury Instructions

2/1/2022: Jury Instructions

Statement of the Case

2/1/2022: Statement of the Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXPERT DISCOVERY

2/7/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXPERT DISCOVERY

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DECLARATION OF DORIA G. THOMAS

2/7/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DECLARATION OF DORIA G. THOMAS

Notice of Ruling

2/8/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED BY THE DEFENDANTS, TO C...)

2/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED BY THE DEFENDANTS, TO C...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT UNCONDITIONAL AS TO THE ENTIRE CASE

2/15/2022: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT UNCONDITIONAL AS TO THE ENTIRE CASE

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

3/9/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

Notice - NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

10/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Request for Dismissal

5/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal as to the entire entire action: As To Parties: Petrol Mobile Fueling Logistics, Inc. (Defendant), Williams Tank Lines Erroneously Sued As WILLIAMS LILL LSG LLC (Defendant), Karapet Babayan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal as to the entire entire action: Filed By: Narine Mkrtchyan (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Name Extension: as to the entire entire action; Result Date: 06/24/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Narine, Mkrtchyan, an individual on 09/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Narine Mkrtchyan as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Narine Mkrtchyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - NOT ENTERED: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Unconditional Notice Filed 02/15/2022 scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Narine, Mkrtchyan, an individual on 09/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Narine Mkrtchyan as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - NOT ENTERED; Filed by: Karapet Babayan (Defendant); Williams Tank Lines Erroneously Sued As WILLIAMS LILL LSG LLC (Defendant); Petrol Mobile Fueling Logistics, Inc. (Defendant); Karapet Babayan (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement Unconditional as to the entire case: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal to Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 3 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Narine, Mkrtchyan, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Karapet, Babayan, an individual (Defendant); WILLIAMS LILL LSG LLC (Defendant); PETROL MOBILE FUELING LOGISTICS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Narine, Mkrtchyan, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Karapet, Babayan, an individual (Defendant); WILLIAMS LILL LSG LLC (Defendant); PETROL MOBILE FUELING LOGISTICS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Narine, Mkrtchyan, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Karapet, Babayan, an individual (Defendant); WILLIAMS LILL LSG LLC (Defendant); PETROL MOBILE FUELING LOGISTICS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less