This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 04:13:23 (UTC).

NARGESS MOZAFARI VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 NARGESS MOZAFARI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6447

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOZAFARI NARGESS

Defendants

FLO CHARGING SOLUTIONS USA INC.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

ADDENERGIE TECHNOLOGIES INC.

ESPLANDE DEL REY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

CONVOY GENESIS LLC

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHIONNING ALEXANDRA ELENA

Defendant Attorney

WEINER MARK R.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/26/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/5/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2024
  • Hearing02/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • Hearing08/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Hearing08/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nargess Mozafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nargess Mozafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nargess Mozafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Convoy Genesis, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nargess Mozafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nargess Mozafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nargess Mozafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nargess Mozafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nargess Mozafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHIONNING ALEXANDRA ELENA