This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 04:54:38 (UTC).

NARGES HOSSEINI VS CALIFORNIA CASUALTY

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 NARGES HOSSEINI filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CALIFORNIA CASUALTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9861

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOSSEINI NARGES

Defendant

CALIFORNIA CASUALTY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/16/2021

2/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/16/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/19/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Narges Hosseini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Narges Hosseini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Narges Hosseini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CASUALTY is a litigant