This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2022 at 05:24:51 (UTC).

NAREN TELEMI VS ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 NAREN TELEMI filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9020

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TELEMI NAREN

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES INC.

ALBERTSTON'S LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAYBROOKE SCOTT EVAN

PAIJUK VAROUJ GEORGE

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/10/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/10/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/10/2022: Complaint

Answer

6/30/2022: Answer

Answer

6/30/2022: Answer

Association of Attorney

9/13/2022: Association of Attorney

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

9/7/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

10/20/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

Request for Dismissal

10/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Albertston's LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Naren Telemi on 06/10/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Naren Telemi as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Naren Telemi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Filed By: Albertston's LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Naren Telemi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: Albertston's LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Albertston's LLC (Defendant); As to: Naren Telemi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Naren Telemi (Plaintiff); As to: Albertson's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Albertston's LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Naren Telemi (Plaintiff); As to: Albertson's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Albertston's LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAIJUK VAROUJ GEORGE