Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 16:00:58 (UTC).

NAPOLEON STEVENS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO TH VS AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 NAPOLEON STEVENS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO TH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0035

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVENS INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO TH NAPOLEON

Defendant

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

Defendant Attorney

SPADA KRISTEN E

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF NAPOLEON STEVENSS REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

3/18/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF NAPOLEON STEVENSS REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/21/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • Hearing07/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Napoleon Stevens, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to th (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF NAPOLEON STEVENS?S REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT; Filed by American Guard Services, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Napoleon Stevens, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to th (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Napoleon Stevens, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to th (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Napoleon Stevens, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to th (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEVENS INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO TH NAPOLEON is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPADA KRISTEN E.