This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 03:55:18 (UTC).

NAOMI ROGERS, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 NAOMI ROGERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8634

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRAIG SIERRA

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

EVANS MARK

MARTIN GARRETT

CLARK III DONALD W.

MOSS STACEY

FORD JOSHUA

LEWIS JAKE

MATTOCK CHRIS

POWELL KRISTIN

GEREAU MICHAEL

RODGERS AMANDA COLON

SEEMAYER JEFFREY

HARVEY AMBER

DUFAU MARK

EHRET MATTHEW

AL-BAWAB GHADA

CRAIG MATTHEW

GARCIA GINA

WAGNER SHANNON VAN

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FOX DAVID A.

Other Attorneys

SIEGLOCK CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

ADLER ENRIQUE ELLIOT

FOX JOANNA LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 1:45 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) ([REDACTED]); Filed by Stacey Moss (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Order RE: Twenty-Fourth petition for coordination of add-on cases; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous) ([REDACTED]); Filed by Stacey Moss (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) ([REDACTED]); Filed by Matthew Craig (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) ([REDACTED]); Filed by Matthew Craig (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous) ([REDACTED]); Filed by Matthew Craig (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous) ([REDACTED]); Filed by Matthew Craig (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Informal Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Stacey Moss (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Mark Evans (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Matthew Ehret (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Matthew Ehret (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Jake Lewis (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Matthew Craig, GAL for minor Sierra Craig); Filed by Matthew Craig (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Matthew Craig, GAL for minor Taylor Craig); Filed by Matthew Craig (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Jeffrey Seemayer (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Chris Mattock, GAL for minor Nathaniel Mattock); Filed by Chris Mattock (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Chris Mattock (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOX JOANNA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGLOCK CHRISTOPHER C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADLER ENRIQUE ELLIOT