This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 06:49:40 (UTC).

NAOMI REISMAN VS HYMAN MANELA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 NAOMI REISMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HYMAN MANELA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4050

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REISMAN NAOMI

Defendants

GOLDENBERG BERISH

MAJOR SOL

MANELA FAMILY TRUST

MANELA HYMAN

MANELA SURVIVOR TRUST

SPIRA RIVKA

SPIRA SHELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEITELBAUM MELVIN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/26/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/26/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

8/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) DUPLICATE REQUEST: Name Extension: (NOT ENTERED) DUPLICATE REQUEST; As To Parties changed from Hyman Manela (Defendant), Sol Major (Defendant) to Rivka Spira (Defendant), Manela Family Trust (Defendant), Manela Survivor Trust (Defendant), Berish Goldenberg (Defendant), Sol Major (Defendant), Shelly Spira (Defendant), Hyman Manela (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) DUPLICATE REQUEST: As To Parties changed from Sol Major (Defendant), Hyman Manela (Defendant) to Shelly Spira (Defendant), Sol Major (Defendant), Hyman Manela (Defendant), Manela Survivor Trust (Defendant), Berish Goldenberg (Defendant), Rivka Spira (Defendant), Manela Family Trust (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/12/2022 at 02:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2737425 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2737426 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2737427 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2737428 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2737429 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2737430 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2737431 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Naomi Reisman (Plaintiff); As to: Hyman Manela (Defendant); Sol Major (Defendant); Rivka Spira (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Naomi Reisman (Plaintiff); As to: Hyman Manela (Defendant); Sol Major (Defendant); Rivka Spira (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Naomi Reisman (Plaintiff); As to: Hyman Manela (Defendant); Sol Major (Defendant); Rivka Spira (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Naomi Reisman (Plaintiff); As to: Hyman Manela (Defendant); Sol Major (Defendant); Rivka Spira (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet in Department 50 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEITELBAUM MELVIN