This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 14:29:24 (UTC).

NAOIMH NELSON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS AARON IRMAS, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 NAOIMH NELSON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AARON IRMAS, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1681

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NELSON AN INDIVIDUAL NAOIMH

Defendants

IRMAS AN INDIVIDUAL AARON

TESLA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA TESLA MOTORS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRUNO ANGELA

BRUNO KEITH J.

Defendant Attorney

BARKER THOMAS DARREN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/20/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Demand for Jury Trial

12/1/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/1/2021: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

11/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/10/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

3/11/2022: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

4/18/2022: Substitution of Attorney

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2024
  • Hearing08/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Hearing02/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by NAOIMH NELSON, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AARON IRMAS, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by NAOIMH NELSON, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by AARON IRMAS, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by AARON IRMAS, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AARON IRMAS, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by NAOIMH NELSON, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NAOIMH NELSON, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NAOIMH NELSON, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NAOIMH NELSON, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tesla Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUNO, KEITH