This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 00:31:26 (UTC).

NANCY TAN VS STEVE DISHAN JAYASINHA ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 NANCY TAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEVE DISHAN JAYASINHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5383

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

TAN NANCY

Respondents, Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

DNWMED.COM

SYNERGY MEDICAL SOLUTIONS

JAYASINHA STEVE DISHAN

DNW SOLUTIONS L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SHIODA GENE H. ESQ.

SHIODA GENE HITOSHI ESQ.

KIM JAMES ALEXANDER

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

KESHAVARZI MOE

KESHAVARZI MOHAMMAD

DWORSKY DAVID ELLIOTT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for

7/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

7/23/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/1/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

8/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

9/10/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/8/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.110(D)

5/16/2018: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.110(D)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/25/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ACCOUNTING; ETC

5/31/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ACCOUNTING; ETC

Minute Order

6/11/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

7/20/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

DEFENDANTS STEVE DISHAN JAVASINHA'S AND DNW SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/15/2018: DEFENDANTS STEVE DISHAN JAVASINHA'S AND DNW SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

2/27/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Related Cases

2/21/2018: Notice of Related Cases

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ACCOUNTING AND CONTRIBUTION; ETC

2/21/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ACCOUNTING AND CONTRIBUTION; ETC

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Plaintiff and Defendant's Failure To Appear At The Final Status Conference) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nancy Tan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 08/01/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/23/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ACCOUNTING; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Steve Dishan Jayasinha (Defendant); DNW Solutions, L.L.C. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.110(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. ACCOUNTING AND CONTRIBUTION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Tan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIODA GENE HITOSHI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JAMES ALEXANDER