This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 09:48:58 (UTC).

NANCY OFELIA VAZQUEZ VS GT RIDE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 NANCY OFELIA VAZQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GT RIDE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK A. BORENSTEIN, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1443

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAZQUEZ NANCY OFELIA

Defendants

LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS LLC

MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER LLC

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY

GT RIDE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERKOVICH GARY

LEVINE MARC ERIC

Defendant Attorneys

GILBERT KEVIN E.

STOCKALPER PATRICK E.

CHU-FUJITA BETTY

HEATH STEPHEN BOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • Hearing10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Status Conference (ReLiquidation as to defendant, GT Ride, LLC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Liquidation as to defendant, GT Ride, L...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff); Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Ofelia Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTEBELLO CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where GT RIDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE MARC ERIC