This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 15:38:22 (UTC).

NANCY MEZA VS MACY'S WEST STORES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 NANCY MEZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MACY'S WEST STORES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0871

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEZA NANCY

Defendants

MACY'S INC.

MACY'S WEST STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COONS MICHAEL HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/7/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2024
  • Hearing08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nancy Meza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Meza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nancy Meza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MACY'S is a litigant

Latest cases where MACY'S WEST STORES INC. AN OHIO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COONS MICHAEL HOWARD