This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2020 at 02:25:44 (UTC).

NANCY MERINO VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/14/2018 NANCY MERINO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6253

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MERINO NANCY

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES COUNTY

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METRO TRANS AUTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KOSHKARYAN VAHAGN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GRIFFIN THOMAS JOSEPH

GRIFFIN THOMAS JOSEPH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE HEARING DATE RE MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

7/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE HEARING DATE RE MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 04/21/2020 FINAL STATUS C...)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 04/21/2020 FINAL STATUS C...)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RE PLAINTIFF NANCY MERINO'S DEPOSITION

4/1/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RE PLAINTIFF NANCY MERINO'S DEPOSITION

Notice of Ruling

4/1/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF NANCY MERINO'S DEPOSITI...)

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF NANCY MERINO'S DEPOSITI...)

Reply - REPLY RE MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION

3/6/2020: Reply - REPLY RE MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION

Notice of Ruling

3/5/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AS COUNSEL FOR PL...)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AS COUNSEL FOR PL...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/4/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON ATTORNEY VAHAGN KOSHKARYAN / KOSHKARYAN LAW GROUP,...) OF 02/04/2020

2/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON ATTORNEY VAHAGN KOSHKARYAN / KOSHKARYAN LAW GROUP,...) OF 02/04/2020

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

2/5/2020: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/6/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/6/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/26/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/29/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

11/28/2018: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/28/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Other - - Demand for Jury Trial

5/14/2018: Other - - Demand for Jury Trial

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • Hearing03/09/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Hearing12/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Nancy Merino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (hearing date re motion to compel deposition); Filed by Los Angeles County Metro Trans Auth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 07/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Deposition of Plaintiff Nancy Merino) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Thomas Joseph Griffin, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Los Angeles County Metro Trans Auth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Los Angeles County Metro Trans Auth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metro Trans Auth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nancy Merino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Merino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Nancy Merino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet /Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706253    Hearing Date: March 13, 2020    Dept: 29

Merino v. Los Angeles County et al.

Defendant’s Motion to Compel Plaintiff’s Deposition; Request for Sanctions is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. Sufficient notice was not provided. The motion was served by mail on 2/20/20. The motion was required to be served by 2/18/20 to allow for 16 court days of notice, increased by five calendar days for service by mail. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 1005(b). Defendant may re-file the motion with proper notice.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

NOTE:  Department 29 will be dark on 03/13/2020.  If the parties submit on the Court’s tentative ruling, no appearance is necessary.  If any party wishes to be heard in connection with the motion, the party must send an e-mail to the Court at SSCDEPT29@LACOURT.ORG, copied on all parties, and the Court will continue the hearing to the earliest convenient date. 

ADMONISHMENT TO COUNSEL FOR FUTURE FILINGS:

Pursuant to the First Amended General Order filed on 5/3/19 regarding mandatory electronic filing, electronic documents must be bookmarked within the document pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 3.1110(f)(4). Electronic bookmarks must include links to the first page of each bookmarked item (e.g. exhibits, declarations, deposition excerpts) and with bookmark titles that identify the book-marked item. The item must be briefly described.

Attachments to primary documents must also be bookmarked. Examples include, but are not limited to the following: depositions, declarations, exhibits, transcripts, medical records, and points and authorities. Use of hyperlinks within documents, including attachments and exhibits is strongly encouraged.

Regardless of the time of electronic filing, a printed courtesy copy (along with proof of electronic submission) is required for pleadings and motions including attachments of 26 pages or more, pleadings and motions that include points and authorities, demurrers, motions for summary judgment/adjudication, and motions to compel further discovery, among other documents. Amended General Order, ¶ 9.

The parties are admonished to comply with the First Amended General Order and Cal Rules of Court 3.110(f)(4) for all future electronically filed documents.

Case Number: BC706253    Hearing Date: March 04, 2020    Dept: 29

Merino v. LACMTA

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362. The order shall be effective upon the filing of a proof of service of the signed order on the client. Cal Rules of Court 3.1362(e).  Counsel remains counsel of record until the proof of service of the signed order is filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC706253    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 29

Merino v. Los Angeles County et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Nancy Merino, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR for defective service. The proof of service reflects that Plaintiff's counsel served only counsel for Defendant. On 8/29/19, defense counsel served a Notice of Change of Address to 800 West 6th Street, Suite 700 in Los Angeles. The motion was served on defense counsel at his old address on 555 S. Flower Street, Suite 4200 in Los Angeles.

The proof of service does not reflect that Plaintiff's counsel served the motion on Nancy Merino.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.