Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2021 at 17:48:28 (UTC).

NANCY LISETTE ALFARO VS CLARA CASTANEDA

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 NANCY LISETTE ALFARO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLARA CASTANEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4011

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ALFARO NANCY LISETTE

TORRES IRON WORK INC.

TORRES ALEJANDRE RAFAEL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CASTANEDA CLARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEYTUNTSYAN ANDREW

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HANFF ROBERT ATLEE

SADIGHIM RAMTIN RAY

Cross Defendant Attorneys

KANG STEVE ANDREW

DEWEY BRIAN SCOTT

ROUSIER SUSAN

SULLIVAN PAUL FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/9/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

2/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

12/21/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 09/28/2020

9/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 09/28/2020

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/20/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

5/27/2020: Answer

Association of Attorney

5/21/2020: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

5/12/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEJANDR...) OF 05/12/2020

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT ALEJANDR...) OF 05/12/2020

Answer

4/3/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/28/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/28/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

12/11/2019: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/9/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • Hearing12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Hearing10/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Torres Iron Work, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Rafael Torres Alejandre (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Clara Castaneda (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Clara Castaneda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Nancy Lisette Alfaro (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Filed by Nancy Lisette Alfaro (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Clara Castaneda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Clara Castaneda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clara Castaneda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nancy Lisette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Lisette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nancy Lisette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nancy Lisette Alfaro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRES IRON WORK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEWEY BRIAN S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANG STEVE A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN PAUL F.