This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 00:09:05 (UTC).

NANCY LESSER VS THE TELEVISION ACADEMY ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/21/2017 NANCY LESSER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE TELEVISION ACADEMY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON, MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4347

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LESSER NANCY

Respondents and Defendants

THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES

THE ANSHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT

THE TELEVISION ACADAMEY

2016 EMMY AWARDS

DOES 1 TO 50

LA LIVE THEATRE LLC

28 AWARDS PRODUCTIONS INC

THE ANSHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT GROUP

28 AWARDS PRODUCTIONS INC. DOE 2

THE TELEVISION ACADEMY AKA 2016 EMMY AWARDS

AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES INC. DOE 1

ERROR

28 AWARDS PRODUCTIONS INC. [DOE 2]

LA LIVE PROPERTIES LLC [DOE 3]

AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES INC. [DOE 1]

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LA LIVE PROPERTIES LLC [DOE 3]

L.A. LIVE THEATER LLC

LA LIVE PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES INC. [DOE 1]

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LESSER JEFF A. ESQ.

LESSER JEFF ALAN ESQ.

LESSER JEFF A.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LENKOV JEFFREY M. ESQ.

HAWKINSON NINA

RAMBIS ALEXANDRA R.

MURO RAYMOND

MURO RAYMOND J.

LENKOV JEFFREY M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY M.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

MURO RAYMOND J.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE AND CREATION OF DANGEROUS CONDITIONS

11/21/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE AND CREATION OF DANGEROUS CONDITIONS

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AT MEDIATION ON JANUARY 25, 2021, AND RESTORATION OF CASE TO ACTIVE STATUS ON

3/10/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AT MEDIATION ON JANUARY 25, 2021, AND RESTORATION OF CASE TO ACTIVE STATUS ON

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE SETTLEMENT

3/11/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE SETTLEMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer - ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF LA LIVE THEATRE, LLC, AND LA LIVE PROPERTIES, LLC; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/8/2020: Answer - ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF LA LIVE THEATRE, LLC, AND LA LIVE PROPERTIES, LLC; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF "PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE" OF AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES

8/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF "PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE" OF AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES

Notice of Lien -

10/4/2018: Notice of Lien -

Association of Attorney

12/18/2019: Association of Attorney

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/19/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/19/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

1/27/2020: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) OF 02/04/2020

2/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) OF 02/04/2020

Notice of Status Conference and Order

2/6/2020: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY

11/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY

Answer

5/2/2019: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DOE 2 IDENTIFIED AS 28 AWARDS PRODUCTIONS, INC.

4/10/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DOE 2 IDENTIFIED AS 28 AWARDS PRODUCTIONS, INC.

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/4/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

SUMMONS -

11/21/2017: SUMMONS -

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nancy Lesser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by 28 Awards Productions, Inc. [DOE 2] (Defendant); The Television Academy (Defendant); American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. [DOE 1] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LA Live Properties, LLC (Cross-Complainant); L.A. Live Theater, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LA Live Properties, LLC [DOE 3] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:54 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AT MEDIATION ON JANUARY 25, 2021, AND RESTORATION OF CASE TO ACTIVE STATUS ON THE TRIAL CALENDAR BASED ON THE CONDUCT OF DEFENDANTS IN ADDING ADDITIONAL TERMS AS CONDITIONS OF) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of 03/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE SETT...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
145 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT, LA LIVE THEATER, LLC, TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Nancy Lesser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Nancy Lesser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Nancy Lesser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Lesser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE AND CREATION OF DANGEROUS CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC684347    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 32

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

NANCY LESSER,

Plaintiff,

v.

THE TELEVISION ACADEMY, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC684347

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 5 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON presiding in DEPT. 52 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the case for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

PlaintiffS shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: February 4, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ERROR is a litigant

Latest cases where LA LIVE THEATRE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LA LIVE PROPERTIES A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant