This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 11:02:16 (UTC).

NANCY LEE ANN PARROTT ET AL VS MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/01/2017 NANCY LEE ANN PARROTT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOANNE B. O'DONNELL and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2043

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOANNE B. O'DONNELL

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COHODAS JUANITA

PARROTT NANCY LEE ANN

Defendants

LAMBIRTH TIMOTHY A.

MURAD MARK

MARCIN LLP

MARCIN JOHN B.

MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP

MILLER LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACKERMAN LEE B.

Defendant Attorneys

NEMECEK FRANK WYNN

COLE JONATHAN BERRES ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Summary of the Case

3/24/2021: Summary of the Case

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE SETTLEMENT

3/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE SETTLEMENT

Request for Dismissal

2/7/2020: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

11/1/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS LAMBIRTH AND MURAD TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/26/2018: PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS LAMBIRTH AND MURAD TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS TIMOTHY A. LAMBIRTH, AND MARK MURAD'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

3/16/2018: DEFENDANTS TIMOTHY A. LAMBIRTH, AND MARK MURAD'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

DEFENDANTS TIMOTHY A. LAMBIRTH, AND MARK MURAD'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPERLY SERVED OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/9/2018: DEFENDANTS TIMOTHY A. LAMBIRTH, AND MARK MURAD'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPERLY SERVED OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/15/2023: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

3/15/2023: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LEE B.. ACKERMAN RE AMOUNT OF INTEREST ACCRUED ON JUDGMENT

3/14/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LEE B.. ACKERMAN RE AMOUNT OF INTEREST ACCRUED ON JUDGMENT

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

3/13/2023: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

3/1/2023: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

7/27/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

7/26/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

5/20/2022: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

5/26/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Default Judgment

5/20/2021: Default Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LEE B. ACKERMAN IN SUPPORT OF [PROPOSED] AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LEE B. ACKERMAN IN SUPPORT OF [PROPOSED] AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles ); Issued by: Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff); As to: Marcin Lambirth, LLP (Defendant); Marcin LLP (Defendant); John B. Marcin (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Lee B.. Ackerman re Amount of Interest Accrued on Judgment; Filed by: Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
264 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-22 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketDocument:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketDocument:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv 01/22/18 at 8:30 am Michelle Williams Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other Intentional Tort-notPI/WD/PD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less