Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 11:10:51 (UTC).

NANCY LEE ANN PARROTT ET AL VS MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/01/2017 NANCY LEE ANN PARROTT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2043

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

COHODAS JUANITA

PARROTT NANCY LEE ANN

Defendants and Respondents

LAMBIRTH TIMOTHY A.

MURAD MARK

MARCIN LLP

MARCIN JOHN B.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP

MILLER LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ACKERMAN LEE B.

Defendant Attorneys

COLE JONATHAN BERRES ESQ.

RYKOFF STEPHEN R.

NEMECEK FRANK WYNN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE SETTLEMENT

3/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE SETTLEMENT

Request for Dismissal

2/7/2020: Request for Dismissal

DEFENDANTS TIMOTHY A. LAMBIRTH, AND MARK MURAD'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

3/16/2018: DEFENDANTS TIMOTHY A. LAMBIRTH, AND MARK MURAD'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

DEFENDANTS TIMOTHY A. LAMBIRTH, AND MARK MURAD'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPERLY SERVED OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/9/2018: DEFENDANTS TIMOTHY A. LAMBIRTH, AND MARK MURAD'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPERLY SERVED OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS LAMBIRTH AND MURAD TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/26/2018: PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS LAMBIRTH AND MURAD TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

11/1/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO ALL D...)

9/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO ALL D...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY LAMBIRTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY LAMBIRTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/22/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL.

9/16/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL.

Minute Order -

2/14/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

4/13/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

5/31/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

6/14/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANTS LKMBIRTH AND MIJRADRS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/12/2018: NOTICE OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANTS LKMBIRTH AND MIJRADRS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

General Denial - General Denial (Second Amended)

10/24/2018: General Denial - General Denial (Second Amended)

Case Management Statement

10/30/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to file proof o...)

2/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to file proof o...)

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • Hearing05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff); Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
224 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff); Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Lee Ann Parrott (Plaintiff); Juanita Cohodas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. LEGAL MALPRACTICE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEMECEK FRANK WYNN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYKOFF STEPHEN R.