This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 12:57:08 (UTC).

NANCY L. DOWNS VS CARDINAL ESCROW, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 NANCY L DOWNS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARDINAL ESCROW, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0496

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOWNS NANCY L.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CARDINAL ESCROW INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Defendant

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS MATTHEW STEPHEN

CUNNINGHAM FRANCIS

Cross Defendant Attorney

GREGORY III G. RICHARD

Other Attorneys

LEIGHT MICHAEL EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/31/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/31/2022: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES; ORDER THEREON

11/15/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES; ORDER THEREON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

7/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN MSC

6/21/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN MSC

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CMC, FSC AND TRIAL DATES

6/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CMC, FSC AND TRIAL DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN MSC

6/2/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN MSC

Case Management Statement

4/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

5/5/2021: Notice of Ruling

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cardinal Escrow, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nancy L. Downs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Dates; Order Thereon); Filed by Chicago Title Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Cardinal Escrow, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Chicago Title Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Nancy L. Downs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Chicago Title Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nancy L. Downs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nancy L. Downs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nancy L. Downs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nancy L. Downs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nancy L. Downs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy L. Downs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARDINAL ESCROW INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEIGHT MICHAEL EDWARD