Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 01:58:18 (UTC).

NANCY KINDER, INDIVIDUALLY VS CAPISTRANO BEACH CARE CENTER, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 NANCY KINDER, INDIVIDUALLY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CAPISTRANO BEACH CARE CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8685

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KINDER INDIVIDUALLY NANCY

KINDER NANCY

Defendants

CAMBRIDGE HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC

CAPISTRANO BEACH CARE CENTER LLC DBA CAPISTRANO BEACH CARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PECK SPENCER ELIOT

PECK SPENCER E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/12/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

4/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Case Management Statement

5/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/23/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

12/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 12/31/2020

12/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 12/31/2020

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

12/31/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/21/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • Hearing06/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by NANCY KINDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (re Continuance of Hearing and Order); Filed by NANCY KINDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 12/31/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NANCY KINDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by NANCY KINDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NANCY KINDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NANCY KINDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NANCY KINDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMBRIDGE HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK SPENCER ELIOT