This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 13:14:15 (UTC).

NANCY ILLINGWORTH VS PETSMART, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 NANCY ILLINGWORTH filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against PETSMART, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0278

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ILLINGWORTH NANCY

Defendant

PETSMART LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLANTZ WILLIAM JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/22/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

5/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2025
  • Hearing04/23/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nancy Illingworth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nancy Illingworth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Illingworth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nancy Illingworth (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLANTZ WILLIAM JOHN