This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 06:23:28 (UTC).

NANCY GUNN VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 NANCY GUNN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1475

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUNN NANCY

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

Defendant Attorney

INGOLD TREVOR J.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

12/13/2022: Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

12/15/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/17/2023: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/7/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2023
  • Hearing07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute; Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • Hearing07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/15/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute; Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT; Filed by: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less