This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2023 at 00:04:53 (UTC).

NANCY GUNN VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 NANCY GUNN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1475

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUNN NANCY

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

Defendant Attorney

INGOLD TREVOR J.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

12/13/2022: Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

12/15/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/17/2023: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/7/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Request for Dismissal

6/15/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; As To Parties changed from American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) to American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute; Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Nancy Gunn on 12/13/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Nancy Gunn as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/15/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute; Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT; Filed by: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nancy Gunn (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less