This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2021 at 20:45:38 (UTC).

NANCY DIANNE BROCKWAY VS HILARI?S AND BROTHERS TRUCKING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 NANCY DIANNE BROCKWAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HILARI S AND BROTHERS TRUCKING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0872

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROCKWAY NANCY DIANNE

Defendants

HILARI?S AND BROTHERS TRUCKING

SEGURA HILARIO NAVARRO

SEGURA ADEMIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAHMANI NICOLE ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS J PAUL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/29/2021: Answer

Motion to Transfer

4/30/2021: Motion to Transfer

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO TRANSFER VENUE

5/7/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO TRANSFER VENUE

PI General Order

2/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nancy Dianne Brockway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOpposition (To Transfer Venue); Filed by Nancy Dianne Brockway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMotion to Transfer (TO TRANSFER VENUE FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS;); Filed by HILARI?S AND BROTHERS TRUCKING (Defendant); HILARIO NAVARRO SEGURA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ADEMIR SEGURA (Defendant); HILARIO NAVARRO SEGURA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Dianne Brockway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nancy Dianne Brockway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nancy Dianne Brockway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nancy Dianne Brockway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAHMANI NICOLE