Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 05:35:11 (UTC).

NANCY CORR VS FACEY MEDICAL GROUP, A MEDICAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 NANCY CORR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FACEY MEDICAL GROUP, A MEDICAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6122

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORR NANCY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FACEY MEDICAL GROUP A MEDICAL CORPORATION

SHAPELL LIBERTY INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LLC

SHAPELL PORTER LLC

Cross Defendant

COBB PROPERTY SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROTHMAN JAY

ROTHMAN JAY STUART ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW YUK

LAW YUK KWONG ESQ.

TRACHTMAN MARC A.

Cross Defendant Attorney

DUNKIN CRAIG L.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/20/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/15/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

10/5/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

10/5/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

6/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE CORR- NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF-CALENDAR

6/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE CORR- NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF-CALENDAR

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/21/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

5/21/2020: Separate Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTIO...)

5/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTIO...)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/8/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Demand for Jury Trial

2/5/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

2/5/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/23/2019: Complaint

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Hearing06/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nancy Corr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by COBB PROPERTY SERVICES (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Shapell Porter, LLC (Cross-Complainant); Shapell Liberty Investment Properties, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (- Compelling Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Special Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Her Attorney of Record) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Shapell Liberty Investment Properties, LLC (Defendant); Shapell Porter, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Shapell Liberty Investment Properties, LLC (Defendant); Shapell Porter, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Shapell Liberty Investment Properties, LLC (Defendant); Shapell Porter, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Nancy Corr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Facey Medical Group, a Medical Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Facey Medical Group, a Medical Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nancy Corr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nancy Corr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nancy Corr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Corr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHAPELL LIBERTY INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facey Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNKIN CRAIG L.