This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 23:04:40 (UTC).

NANCY CABIBI ET AL VS AVON PRODUCTS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 NANCY CABIBI filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AVON PRODUCTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN S. CURREY, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, ANN I. JONES, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III, STUART M. RICE and TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5257

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN S. CURREY

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

ANN I. JONES

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

STUART M. RICE

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

CABIBI PHIL

CABIBI NANCY

Defendants and Appellants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC.

DAVILA INC.

PFIZER INC.

DAVION INC.

AVON PRODUCTS INC.

WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC.

VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC.

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BARTLETT JENNIFER L. ESQ.

SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER PC

GREENSTONE DAVID CARL

LANGHOFF MARISSA CHRISTINA

PURDY STUART JAMES

Respondent, Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

BHIMANI JAY L

EVERETT DOREY LLP

BRANSCOME KIMBERLY O.

CALFO ALEXANDER GERARD

SADUN BENJAMIN MAXWELL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Motion for Sanctions - Motion for Monetary Sanctions Regarding Johnson & Johnson's Improper Removal of this Case to Federal Court

5/10/2019: Motion for Sanctions - Motion for Monetary Sanctions Regarding Johnson & Johnson's Improper Removal of this Case to Federal Court

Brief - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15

7/19/2019: Brief - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAY BHIMANI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 28 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM ALICE BLOUNT AND ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT DR. BLOUNT TESTED ANY JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM

7/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAY BHIMANI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 28 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY FROM ALICE BLOUNT AND ANY EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT DR. BLOUNT TESTED ANY JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM

Opposition - DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.23 TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE EXPERT BRENT FINLEY FROM OFFERING ANY NON-EXPERT OF EXPERT OPINIONS AT TRIAL AND TO PRECLUDE ANY OTHER DEF

8/8/2019: Opposition - DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.23 TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE EXPERT BRENT FINLEY FROM OFFERING ANY NON-EXPERT OF EXPERT OPINIONS AT TRIAL AND TO PRECLUDE ANY OTHER DEF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL / LONG-CAUSE)

9/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL / LONG-CAUSE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL / LONG-CAUSE)

9/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL / LONG-CAUSE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL / LONG-CAUSE)

9/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL / LONG-CAUSE)

Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict

11/14/2019: Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAY BHIMANI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

11/14/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAY BHIMANI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

Motion for New Trial

11/14/2019: Motion for New Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS' MOTION

11/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS' MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS'

11/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS'

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL [EXHIBITS 43-55, PART 4 OF 6]

11/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL [EXHIBITS 43-55, PART 4 OF 6]

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS' MOTION

11/25/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS' MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL [EXHIBITS 21-42, PART 3 OF 6]

11/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO THE J&J DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL [EXHIBITS 21-42, PART 3 OF 6]

337 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15; Status Conference ((Simon Greenstone Panatier))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Not Entered; Filed by Nancy Cabibi (Plaintiff); Phil Cabibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Not Entered; Filed by Nancy Cabibi (Plaintiff); Phil Cabibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order Cancelling Post-Judgment & Appeal Bond and Releasing Surety; Filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Defendant); JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 01/28/20 B304249); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B304249); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
379 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.'S CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS AND ADDITIONAL FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketNotice -Notice of Change of Hearings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketNotice -WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SIGNED DECLARATION OF DENNIS ST. GEORGE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH; PROOF OF SERVICE [C.C.P. 418.10]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICT LIABILITY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Cabibi (Plaintiff); Phil Cabibi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Davila, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where AVON PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant