Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 08:51:42 (UTC).

NANCY BUSHNELL VS NOLAN BUSHNELL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 NANCY BUSHNELL filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against NOLAN BUSHNELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0858

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUSHNELL NANCY

Defendants

BUSHNELL NOLAN

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLD GEOFFREY M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

5/17/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

5/17/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

5/17/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • Hearing11/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by NANCY BUSHNELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by NANCY BUSHNELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by NANCY BUSHNELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NANCY BUSHNELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NANCY BUSHNELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NANCY BUSHNELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLD GEOFFREY M. ESQ.