This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 05:15:51 (UTC).

NANCY BROWN VS AVANTI HOSPITALS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 NANCY BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AVANTI HOSPITALS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7010

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN NANCY

Defendants

PIPELINE HEALTH LLC

GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P.

AVANTI HOSPITALS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CHARLES STEPHANIE

Other Attorneys

SCHNEBERG KYLE

SCHNEBERG KYLE PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/8/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/23/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CARMEN VIGIL

3/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CARMEN VIGIL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/22/2021: Answer

Answer

3/22/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/22/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURS...) OF 03/23/2021

3/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURS...) OF 03/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURS...)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/12/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2024
  • Hearing02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Hearing08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NANCY BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PIPELINE HEALTH, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by NANCY BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer Purs...) of 03/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer Purs...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Carmen Vigil); Filed by AVANTI HOSPITALS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AVANTI HOSPITALS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NANCY BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NANCY BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NANCY BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NANCY BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NANCY BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PIPELINE HEALTH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AVANTI HOSPITALS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEBERG KYLE PHILIP