Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2021 at 17:52:06 (UTC).

NANCY ALATRISTE, ET AL. VS SCOTT JAMES MURPHY

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 NANCY ALATRISTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SCOTT JAMES MURPHY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1718

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALATRISTE NANCY

ALATRISTE ALEJANDRA

Defendant

MURPHY SCOTT JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIMENEZ DANIEL F

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2024
  • Hearing03/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • Hearing09/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nancy Alatriste (Plaintiff); Alejandra Alatriste (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nancy Alatriste (Plaintiff); Alejandra Alatriste (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nancy Alatriste (Plaintiff); Alejandra Alatriste (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JIMENEZ DANIEL F.