This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2020 at 07:15:49 (UTC).

NANA TSITSUASHVILI VS LUIS JORGE VIVANCO MAYORGA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 NANA TSITSUASHVILI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS JORGE VIVANCO MAYORGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5853

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSITSUASHVILI NANA

Defendants

MAYORGA LUIS JORGE VIVANCO

MCLAREN ROSS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHODOROVSKY ASLAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/16/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/9/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nana Tsitsuashvili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nana Tsitsuashvili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nana Tsitsuashvili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nana Tsitsuashvili (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHODOROVSKY ASLAN