This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 01:31:45 (UTC).

NAME ON THE LINE ADVERTISING VS THE LOUVER SHOP INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2018 NAME ON THE LINE ADVERTISING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE LOUVER SHOP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7107

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

5 MILE MEDIA

NAME ON THE LINE ADVERTISING

Defendants

DOES 1-25

THE LOUVER SHOP INC.

DANMER CUSTOM WINDOW COVERINGS

AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS LLC

DANMER CUSTOM SHUTTERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLOVER JON-RENE MOORE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/2/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Name on the Line Advertising (Plaintiff); 5 Mile Media (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Name on the Line Advertising (Plaintiff); 5 Mile Media (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Summons-Issued; Filed by Name on the Line Advertising (Plaintiff); 5 Mile Media (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Home Products Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER JON-RENE MOORE