This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2021 at 01:42:56 (UTC).

NALELEO'NALANI LEE ET AL VS ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 NALELEO'NALANI LEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2535

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff

YOUNG JASMONE

Defendants and Respondents

ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER

SEIF MEDHAT INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 30

MEDHAT SEIF M.D. INC.

MATERNAL-FETAL MEDICINE ASSOCIATES A MEDICAL CORPORATION

OGUNDIPE ANTHONY M.D.

Minor

LEE NALELEO'NALANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WATSON ALEXANDER M.

LYNCH GREGORY G. ESQ.

DEFALCO HEATHER ANN

LYNCH GREGORY GORDON ESQ.

Minor Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHELS & LEW

Other Attorneys

MICHELS PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING THE CONFIDENTIAL UNREDACTED DECLARATION OF JOHN D SCHUMACHER ESQ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS MED HAT SEIF

10/16/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING THE CONFIDENTIAL UNREDACTED DECLARATION OF JOHN D SCHUMACHER ESQ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS MED HAT SEIF

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

10/23/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/23/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

11/1/2019: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

11/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

11/4/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/04/2019

11/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/04/2019

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE HEARING; NOTICE OF FSC AND TRIAL DATE VACATED

11/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE HEARING; NOTICE OF FSC AND TRIAL DATE VACATED

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MARTIN P. WENIZ IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

11/12/2019: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MARTIN P. WENIZ IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION) OF 11/13/2019

11/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION) OF 11/13/2019

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

12/9/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATI...)

1/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATI...) OF 01/29/2020

1/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATI...) OF 01/29/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE) OF 04/16/2020

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS MEDHAT SEIF MD AND MEDHAT SEIF MD INC AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL SETTLEM

4/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS MEDHAT SEIF MD AND MEDHAT SEIF MD INC AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL SETTLEM

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (/ proof of funding of annuity) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jasmone Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AND OSC RE: PROOF OF FUNDING OF TRUST); Filed by Jasmone Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for determination of good faith settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (/ proof of funding of annuity) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) / proof of fun...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (Proof of Funding Annuity); Filed by Jasmone Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Approve Petition For Minor?s Compromise) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Jasmone Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by St Francis Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE ON BEHALF OF NALELEO' NALANI LEE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692535    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

NALELEO’NALANI LEE, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, et al.,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC692535

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Jasmone Young (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Naleoleo-Nalani Lee (“Claimant”). The settlement appears to be fair and reasonable, and the attorneys’ fees appear to be appropriate, given the nature of the case. However, the Court is concerned because the petition suggests Claimant will have ongoing medical needs, including additional therapy for the injury at issue. Yet, Petitioner intends to invest the settlement in a single-premium deferred annuity, which suggests that this money will not be available to treat Claimant’s ongoing medical needs.

The Court continued this hearing to November 15, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. to afford Petitioner an opportunity to consider this issue. In the interim, Plaintiff’s counsel filed a declaration stating that the Medi-Cal lien of $79,557.58 is not final, and he expects Medi-Cal to reduce the lien by at least 25%, which should cover any future medical needs. Plaintiff’s counsel proposes that he keep $79,557.58 in his client trust account until this issue is resolved and then deposit the remainder into a blocked account. While the Court appreciates that Plaintiff’s counsel takes the initiative to propose a solution to this problem, the Court cannot adopt this proposal. The Court cannot approve this settlement until the Medi-Cal lien is finalized and it is clear how much of the settlement will be set aside to cover future medical needs. Nor can the Court allow funds to remain in the client-trust account unsupervised by the Court.

Based upon the foregoing, the Court takes the hearing on the petition off-calendar. Once the Medi-Cal lien is finalized, Petitioner shall file an amended petition reflecting the new amounts, including the amount that would be placed into a blocked account (i.e., the amount of the Medi-Cal reduction that would be used for future medical needs). Petitioner also shall prepare a proposed order approving the settlement, as well as a proposed order for deposit of funds into a blocked account.

The Court’s clerk shall provide notice of this order.

DATED: November 13, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC692535    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

NALELEO’NALANI LEE, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, et al.,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC692535

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Jasmone Young (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Naleoleo-Nalani Lee (“Claimant”). The settlement appears to be fair and reasonable, and the attorneys’ fees appear to be appropriate, given the nature of the case. However, the Court is concerned because the petition suggests Claimant will have ongoing medical needs, including additional therapy for the injury at issue. Yet, Petitioner intends to invest the settlement in a single-premium deferred annuity, which suggests that this money will not be available to treat Claimant’s ongoing medical needs. Therefore, the Court intends to discuss this issue with Petitioner.

DATED: November 1, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDHAT SEIF M.D. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MATERNAL FETAL MEDICINE ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant