This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2023 at 19:41:28 (UTC).

NAIRI ATAMIAN, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 NAIRI ATAMIAN, filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1257

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ATAMIAN NAIRI

MILLER ROCHELLE

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAGDASARIAN MILDRED REGINA

FRANTZ JAMES P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/19/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/30/2023

1/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/30/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AS TO BRENDAN SUAREZ)

2/2/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AS TO BRENDAN SUAREZ)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AS TO ELIJAH SILVER)

2/2/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AS TO ELIJAH SILVER)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AS TO BRENDAN SUAREZ)

2/2/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AS TO BRENDAN SUAREZ)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

2/2/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/15/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/17/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AND ENTERED AS TO F ROCHELLE MILLER

3/23/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AND ENTERED AS TO F ROCHELLE MILLER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal filed and entered as to Rochelle Miller: Name Extension changed from filed and entered as to f Rochelle Miller to filed and entered as to Rochelle Miller ; As To Parties changed from Edison International (Defendant), Southern California Edison Company (Defendant) to Southern California Edison Company (Defendant), Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed and entered as to f Rochelle Miller; Filed by: Rochelle Miller (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint for Damages; Filed by: Nairi Atamian (Plaintiff); Elijah Silver (Plaintiff); Brendan Suarez (Plaintiff); Rochelle Miller (Plaintiff); Violet Silver (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: Violet (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); Type: Fictitious Name

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: Violet (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 03/15/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Edison International (Defendant), Southern California Edison Company (Defendant) to Southern California Edison Company (Defendant), Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Violet (Plaintiff); As to: Violet (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (as to Elijah Silver); Signed and Filed by: Elijah Silver (Plaintiff); As to: Elijah Silver (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (as to Brendan Suarez); Signed and Filed by: Brendan Suarez (Plaintiff); As to: Brendan Suarez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Violet (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 02/02/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Violet (Plaintiff) to Violet (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (as to Elijah Silver): Filed By: Elijah Silver (Plaintiff),Violet (Plaintiff),Rochelle Miller (Plaintiff),Brendan Suarez (Plaintiff),Nairi Atamian (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 02/02/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Edison International (Defendant), Southern California Edison Company (Defendant) to Elijah Silver (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 14 - Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 01/30/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nairi Atamian (Plaintiff); Elijah Silver (Plaintiff); Violet (Plaintiff); Brendan Suarez (Plaintiff); Rochelle Miller (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nairi Atamian (Plaintiff); Elijah Silver (Plaintiff); Violet (Plaintiff); Brendan Suarez (Plaintiff); Rochelle Miller (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less