This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 22:31:51 (UTC).

NAILAH SMITH VS BRUCE B MCLUCAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 NAILAH SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BRUCE B MCLUCAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE W. MANDEL, JON R. TAKASUGI, H. JAY FORD III and LAWRENCE CHO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2013

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE W. MANDEL

JON R. TAKASUGI

H. JAY FORD III

LAWRENCE CHO

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

SMITH NAILAH

Petitioner

HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE GROUP

Defendants and Respondents

FIBROID TREATMENT COLLECTIVE A MEDICAL

THE CENTER FOR SURGERY LLC

SOFFER MICHAEL JAY

BRUCE B. MCLUCAS M.D. A PROFESSIONAL COR

MICHAEL J. SOFFER M.D. INC.

ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES LOS ANGELES

DAIGNAULT MICHAEL M.D.

KALATZIS CHRISTOS M.D.

LANG RONALD M.D.

MCLUCAS BRUCE B. M.D.

OLYMPIA HEALTH CARE LLC DBA OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAND-LEWIS SUZANNE ELIZABETH ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ROBINSON ADAM LEWIS

NERI BETH ANN

OZERAN DAVID J.

SCHAFER TERRENCE JOSEPH

VOGT EMILY COVINGTON

CARROLL RICHARD DOUGLAS

DASILVA DANIEL GARCIA

COSTA KAYTEE VOTA

MCANDREWS THOMAS FRANCIS

WEINBERG DANIEL ZACHARY

LOPEZ LAURA GABRIELA

MEISSNER CHRISTINA N

MUEHL ALEXANDRA JOSEPHINE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE PROPOSED JUDGMENT

2/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE PROPOSED JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

11/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

12/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

6/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO MICHAEL DAIGNAULT, M.D.

6/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO MICHAEL DAIGNAULT, M.D.

Complaint -

6/25/2018: Complaint -

Notice of Ruling

5/8/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER)

5/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER TO REOPE...)

5/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER TO REOPE...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

5/8/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Exhibit List

5/3/2023: Exhibit List

Exhibit List

5/4/2023: Exhibit List

Jury Instructions

5/4/2023: Jury Instructions

Statement of the Case

5/4/2023: Statement of the Case

Witness List

5/4/2023: Witness List

Notice - NOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

5/4/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

442 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order to Reopen Discovery and Compel Deposition of Leslie Rand-Luby, M.D.: Name Extension: blank ; Exact Name: Motion for Order to Reopen Discovery and Compel Deposition of Leslie Rand-Luby, M.D. ; As To Parties changed from Nailah Smith (Plaintiff) to Nailah Smith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order to Reopen Discovery and Compel Deposition of Leslie Rand-Luby, M.D.: Filed By: Bruce B. McLucas, M.D. (Defendant); Result: Denied ; Result Date: 05/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Bruce B. McLucas, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Order to Reope...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 09:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/20/2023 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order to Reopen Discovery or, in the Alternative, Motion to Compel the Deposition of Leslie Rand-Luby, M.D. scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 09:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O updated: Result Date to 05/08/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
877 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nailah Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Alecto Healthcare Services Los Angeles (Defendant); Service Date: 12/05/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nailah Smith (Plaintiff); As to: The Center for Surgery, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 12/05/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nailah Smith (Plaintiff); As to: M.D., Michael Daignault (Defendant); Service Date: 12/05/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 3 - Hon. Jon R. Takasugieffective 02/04/2019; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Med Malpractice (Drs & Surgeons)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 12/09/19 at 10:00 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 12/26/19 at 8:30 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 06/25/21 at 8:30 am Marc D. Gross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2013 Hearing Date: September 1, 2022 Dept: O

Case Name: Smith v. McLucas, et al.

Case No.: ****2013

Complaint Filed: 6-25-18

Hearing Date: 7-19-22

Discovery C/O: 8-26-22 (limited reopening)

Calendar No.: 4

Discover Motion C/O: 9-12-22 (limited reopening)

POS: OK

Trial Date: 9-26-22

SUBJECT: MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Bruce B. McLucas M.D., Bruce B. McLucas, MD, a professional corporation and Fibroid Treatment Collective

RESP. PARTY: Plaintiff Nailah Smith

TENTATIVE RULING

Defendants Bruce B. McLucas M.D., Bruce B. McLucas, MD and Fibroid Treatment Collective’s Motion for Terminating Sanctions is DENIED. No lesser sanction for discovery abuse was requested.

I. Applicable Law

Terminating sanctions should not be imposed lightly and a graduated imposition of

sanctions should be used if possible. See Mileikowsky v. Tenet Healthsystem (2005) 128

Cal.App.4th 262, 279-280 (decision to impose terminating sanctions should not be made lightly

but such sanctions are justified in cases of repeated discovery abuse and evidence that lesser

sanctions will be ineffectual); Thomas v. Luong (1986) 187 Cal.App.3d 76, 81–82; see also

Morgan v. Ransom (1979) 95 Cal.App.3d 664, 669 (incarcerated, indigent, pro per plaintiff's

delay in serving responses insufficient to justify imposition of terminating sanctions where no

prejudice demonstrated). Moreover, discovery sanctions are not intended to punish but to

accomplish discovery. See Newland v. Supr. Ct. (1995) 40 Cal.App.4th 608, 613.

“The discovery statutes…evince an incremental approach to discovery sanctions, starting with monetary sanctions and ending with the ultimate sanction of termination. Although in extreme cases a court has the authority to order a terminating sanction as a first measure, a terminating sanction should generally not be imposed until the court has attempted less severe alternatives and found them to be unsuccessful and/or the record clearly shows lesser sanctions would be ineffective.” Lopez v. Watchtower Bible & Tract Society of New York, Inc. (2016) 246 Cal.App.4th 566, 604.

II. Terminating sanctions are unwarranted in light of Plaintiff’s ultimate compliance with the discovery requests

Defendants argue the following instances of discovery abuse committed by Plaintiff:

(1) Plaintiff failed to timely respond to discovery propounded on 3-12-20 (“3-12-20 Discovery”), despite being granted two extensions.

(2) After responses were served to the 3-12-20 Discovery, further responses were required and parties entered into a stipulation requiring further responses by 11-16-20, which Plaintiff failed comply with until 12-23-20.

(3) On 6-9-21, the Court held an IDC regarding Defendant’s 1-15-21 Discovery. Plaintiff stipulated during the IDC to provide further responses to Defendant McLucas’s Form Interrogatories (set two), RFAs (set two) and RFP (set two) by 6-24-2. Plaintiff did not comply until another IDC was held on 6-24-21 and further responses were served on 7-8-21.

(4) On 11-2-21, Defendant propounded Special Interrogatories (Set Three), Request for Admission (Set Three), RFPs (Set Three) and Form Interrogatories (Set Three)(“11-2-21 Discovery”), as the parties allegedly stipulated. Plaintiff responded to the 11-2-21 Discovery with objections only.

(5) On 3-31-22, parties stipulated to reopen discovery and allow Defendants to propound Special Interrogatories (Set Two), Special Interrogatories (Set Three), RFPs (Set Three), RFAs (Set Three) and Form Interrogatories (Set Three) (“3-31-22 Discovery”). Plaintiff responded to the 3-31-22 Discovery with objections only despite having stipulated to reopening discovery for the 3-31-22 Discovery.

(6) Plaintiff repeatedly refused to appear for deposition as repeatedly noticed and finally appeared for deposition on 8-19-21, more than a year after the first deposition notice was served and after the discovery cut off.

Based on these identified instances of discovery abuse, terminating sanctions are not warranted. Plaintiff ultimately complied with the discovery identified throughout the litigation. Plaintiff provided responses throughout the litigation. Unlike the plaintiff in Mileikowsky, her compliance was not “only” due to the “threat of terminating sanctions.” Mileikowsky, supra, 128 Cal.App.4th at 280.

To the extent Plaintiff served untimely responses or asserted meritless objections, Defendant could have requested monetary sanctions or other lesser sanctions. Discovery sanctions are not intended to be punitive and should only be imposed to accomplish discovery. See Lopez v. Watchtower Bible & Tract Society of New York, Inc. (2016) 246 Cal.App.4th 566, 604.

The parties’ stipulations are tantamount to discovery orders for purposes of sanctions, particularly since a number of them were arrived at during an IDC with the Court. “The issue becomes whether the stipulation can be seen as tantamount to the requisite order. We see no reason why it cannot.” Mileikowsky, supra, 128 Cal.App.4th at 278–279. However, the mere fact that Plaintiff committed discovery abuse does not automatically entitle McLucas to terminating sanctions. Again, McLucas could have requested monetary sanctions or issue sanctions in response to each instance of delayed discovery responses and/or meritless objections.

Plaintiff adopts the ridiculous position that a stipulation to propound discovery does not amount to a discovery order requiring a response. If the parties stipulated to allow for discovery, Plaintiff was required to respond as she was required to respond to any legitimately propounded discovery under the Code. To interpret the stipulation otherwise would be illogical. There would be no reason stipulate to discovery if Plaintiff was not required to answer. A failure to answer entirely would qualify as discovery abuse under CCP 2023.010.

However, Plaintiff ultimately responded to all stipulated discovery, although untimely and with objections only. On this point, the Court agrees with Plaintiff. Plaintiff was entitled to assert objections to discovery and she did not waive that right in the stipulations. If her objections were meritless, Defendant McLucas was entitled under the Code to move for further response and obtain monetary, issue, or evidentiary sanctions against Plaintiff.

Defendant McLucas’s Motion for Terminating Sanctions is DENIED.

Case Name: Smith v. McLucas, et al.

Case No.: ****2013

Complaint Filed: 6-25-18

Hearing Date: 7-19-22

Discovery C/O: 8-26-22 (limited reopening)

Calendar No.: 4

Discover Motion C/O: 9-12-22 (limited reopening)

POS: OK

Trial Date: 9-26-22

SUBJECT: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO RFPs (Set Three)

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Bruce B. McLucas M.D., Bruce B. McLucas, MD, a professional corporation, and Fibroid Treatment Collective

RESP. PARTY: Plaintiff Nailah Smith

TENTATIVE RULING

Defendants Bruce B. McLucas M.D., Bruce B. McLucas, MD and Fibroid Treatment Collective’s Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFPs (Set Three) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to serve further responses without objections within 5 days. Defendants failed to request any monetary sanctions.

Defendants seek responses to 3 RFPs, which seek documentation pertaining to Plaintiff’s Toradol prescription. Plaintiff responded only with objections. Defendants argue Plaintiff stipulated to allow Defendants to propound these interrogatories. Despite the stipulation, Plaintiff objected to the discovery on grounds that the declaration of necessity was inadequate.

In response, Plaintiff argues she never stipulated to respond to the discovery, nor did she ever stipulate to waive objections. Plaintiff argues Defendants never met and conferred in good faith prior to filing this motion. Plaintiff maintains the discovery requests cover topics already covered during deposition and in prior discovery. Plaintiff argues Defendants have already obtained her full medical records and the discovery is unnecessary and duplicative.

Plaintiff’s objections are meritless. Plaintiff also fails to identify precisely what prior discovery responses would have responded to the subject RFPs. She fails to establish that the discovery requests are improperly duplicative.

Case Name: Smith v. McLucas, et al.

Case No.: ****2013

Complaint Filed: 6-25-18

Hearing Date: 7-19-22

Discovery C/O: 8-26-22 (limited reopening)

Calendar No.: 4

Discover Motion C/O: 9-12-22 (limited reopening)

POS: OK

Trial Date: 9-26-22

SUBJECT: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO)

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Bruce B. McLucas M.D., Bruce B. McLucas, MD, a professional corporation and Fibroid Treatment Collective

RESP. PARTY: Plaintiff Nailah Smith

TENTATIVE RULING

Defendants Bruce B. McLucas M.D., Bruce B. McLucas, MD and Fibroid Treatment Collective’s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set Two) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to serve further responses without objections within 5 days. Defendants did not request any monetary sanctions in connection with the motion.

Defendants seek responses to 16 interrogatories, which seek information regarding Toradol and Ibuprofen taken by Plaintiff from 6-30-17 to 7-4-17. Plaintiff responded only with objections. Defendants argue Plaintiff stipulated to allow Defendants to propound these interrogatories. Despite the stipulation, Plaintiff objected to the discovery on grounds that the declaration of necessity was inadequate.

In response, Plaintiff argues she never stipulated to respond to the discovery, nor did she ever stipulate to waive objections. Plaintiff argues Defendants never met and conferred in good faith prior to filing this motion. Plaintiff maintains the discovery requests cover topics already covered during deposition and in prior discovery. Plaintiff argues Defendants have already obtained her full medical records and the discovery is unnecessary and duplicative.

Plaintiff’s objections are meritless. Plaintiff fails to identify precisely what prior discovery responses would have responded to the subject Special Interrogatories. She fails to establish that the discovery requests are improperly duplicative.



Case Number: ****2013 Hearing Date: August 16, 2022 Dept: O

Case Name: Nailah Smith v. Bruce B McLucas, et al.

Case No.: ****2013

Hearing: 8-16-22

Calendar #: 10

Notice: OK

Complaint Filed: 06-25-18

Motion C/O:

Discovery C/O:

Trial Date: 09-26-22

SUBJECT:

(1) PETITION FOR FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

MOVING PARTY: (1) Defendants Bruce D. McLucas, M.D., Bruce D. McLucas, M.D., a professional corporation, Fibroid Treatment Collective, and Hilltop Specialty Insurance Company (formerly known as Hudson Specialty Insurance Company)

RESP. PARTY: (1) Plaintiff Nailah Smith

(2) MOTION TO STRIKE PETITION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

MOVING PARTY: (2) Plaintiff Nailah Smith

RESP. PARTY: (2) Defendants Bruce D. McLucas, M.D., Bruce D. McLucas, M.D., a professional corporation, Fibroid Treatment Collective, and Hilltop Specialty Insurance Company (formerly known as Hudson Specialty Insurance Company).

Intervenor, Hudson Specialty Insurance Company aka Hilltop Specialty Insurance Company’s (collectively “Hudson”) Petition for leave to intervene under CCP 387 is GRANTED. Hudson is added as a named defendant in this action forthwith.

Prior to filing its answer to the complaint, however, Hudson must post a bond under CCP 1616 in an amount that the Court determines is sufficient to secure the payment of any final judgment which may be rendered in this action against the McLucas defendants.

The Court determines the amount of the bond to be posted by Hudson is . The bond is to be posted within 10 days. Thereafter, Hudson may file its answer forthwith. If a bond is not posted timely, the answer may not be filed, and the Court will order a default be entered against Hudson.

Plaintiff’s Motion to Strike Hudson’s Petition is DENIED.

Plaintiff’s Motion for Sanctions under CCP 128.7 is DENIED



Case Number: ****2013 Hearing Date: July 7, 2022 Dept: O

Case Name: Smith v. McLucas, et al.

Case No.: ****2013

Complaint Filed: 6-25-18

Hearing Date: 7-7-22

Discovery C/O: 8-26-22 (limited reopening)

Calendar No.: 8

Discover Motion C/O: 9-12-22 (limited reopening)

POS: OK

Trial Date: 9-26-22

SUBJECT: MOTION TO TAX COSTS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Nailah Smith

RESP. PARTY: Defendant Ronald Lang, MD

TENTATIVE RULING

Plaintiff’s Motion to Tax Costs is DENIED as to Item 1(f) and GRANTED as to Item 1(d): $60 filing fee for motion for terminating sanctions, and Item 5(a): $1,580 service of process costs incurred in connection with deposition subpoenas. Court to sign proiposed order filed .

Plaintiff challenges Items 1(d) ($60 filing fee for motion for terminating sanctions), 1(f) (filing fee for exparte to shorten time to here MSJ) and 5(a) ($1,580 service of process costs incurred in connection with deposition subpoenas.) Filing and motion fees are expressly recoverable under CCP 1033.5(a)(1). Service of process fees are also expressly recoverable under CCP 1033.5(a)(4). The burden is therefore on Plaintiff to establish that the fees incurred in connection with the Motion for Terminating Sanctions and the ex parte application to shorten time were unnecessary or unreasonable. See Rozanova, supra, 68 Cal.App.4th at 459.

Plaintiff establishes that the motion for terminating sanctions was not reasonably necessary to the conduct of the litigation. It is undisputed that the fees were paid, but Defendant never filed the motion. This is distinguishable from the usual scenario of a motion being denied after it was filed or taken off calendar because other circumstances rendered it moot. The motion to strike the $60 in filing fees for the motion for terminating sanctions is GRANTED.

Plaintiff fails to establish that the ex parte application to specially set Lang’s summary judgment for hearing was unreasonable or unnecessary. The ex parte application was granted, the Court having found the requested order to be necessary in order to comply with statutory deadlines applicable to MSJs. The motion to strike the $60 ex parte filing fee is DENIED.

Plaintiff establishes that Item 5 for Service of Process costs is objectionable. The costs are for “subpoena various medical records.” See Memo of Costs, Item 5(a). Defendant Lang failed to identify the name of the person served, nor does it appear the costs were for service of process, e.g. service of a deposition subpoena. Instead, it appears the costs are to obtain the medical records themselves. Defendant submits invoices to support the costs sought under Item 5(a). See Opposition, Ex. G. The invoices are not clearly for service of the deposition subpoenas. The invoices indicate they are for items such as “base fee-subpoena,” “subpoena preparation,” “witness fee,” “check charge” and “bates stamping.” Plaintiff’s motion to tax costs is granted as to Item 5(a).



Case Number: ****2013 Hearing Date: March 17, 2022 Dept: O

Case Name: Smith v. McLucas, et al.

Case No.: ****2013

Complaint Filed: 6-25-18

Hearing Date: 3-17-22

Discovery C/O: 1-22-21

Calendar No.: 11

Discover Motion C/O: 2-8-21

POS: OK

Trial Date: 4-11-22

SUBJECT: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Ronald Lang, M.D.

RESP. PARTY: None as of 3-14-22 (Notice of Non-Opposition filed by Defendant Lang)

TENTATIVE RULING

Defendant Ronald Lang M.D.’s Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff did not file an opposition to this MSJ.

The only remaining cause of action alleged against Defendant Lang is for professional negligence. Defendant negates the essential elements of breach and causation with the expert declaration of Eric Wechsler, M.D. See Defendant’s SSUMF Nos. 21-28. Defendant submits evidence that the care he rendered to Plaintiff was within the applicable standard of care and that nothing he did or failed to do caused or contributed to the Plaintiff’s claimed injuries or damages. Id.; Dec. of D. Wechsler, 26-33.

Defendant satisfies their burden as moving party on summary judgment, and the burden shifts to Plaintiff to raise a triable issue of material fact as to breach and causation. Plaintiff failed to file any opposition. No triable issues of material fact remain. Defendant Lang’s Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED.



b'

Case Number: ****2013 Hearing Date: September 16, 2021 Dept: O

Case Name: Smith v. McLucas, et al.

Case No.: ****2013

Complaint Filed: 6-25-18

Hearing Date: 9-16-21

Discovery C/O: 7-16-21

Calendar No.: 7

Discover Motion C/O: 7-30-21

POS: OK

Trial Date: 4-11-22

SUBJECT: MOTION TO TAX COSTS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Nailah Smith

RESP. PARTY: Defendants Michael Jay Soffer, MD and Michael Jay Soffer, MD, Inc.

TENTATIVE RULING

Plaintiff Nailah Smith’s Motion to Tax Costs in the amount of $5,157 is GRANTED. Defendants Soffer and Michael Jay Soffer, MD, Inc. filed a notice of non-opposition, stipulating that the costs at issue be taxed. Judgment shall reflect costs in the remaining amount of $1,614 as set forth in the memo of costs filed on 6-23-21.

'


Case Number: ****2013    Hearing Date: January 14, 2021    Dept: O

Case Name: Smith v. McLucas, et al.

Case No.: ****2013

Complaint Filed: 6-25-18

Hearing Date: 1-14-21

Calendar No.: 9

TENTATIVE RULING

 

Defendant Michael Daignault’s motion for terminating sanctions (joined in by the remaining defendants) is DENIED.

Plaintiff’s counsel stipulated to an order compelling Plaintiff to provide responses and supplemental responses to numerous discovery requests. Plaintiff timely provided most of the responses before the Court ordered December 1, 2020 deadline. On December 4, 2020 Plaintiff’s counsel emailed all counsel explain why the remaining responses were not yet provided and expressed his intention to provide those responses. The last of the responses were served on December 23, 2020

In the meantime, on December 4, 2020 Defendant Daignault filed and served the instant motion for terminating sanctions to be heard on January 14, 2020. Defendant did not request any lesser sanction.

            “Taking an incremental approach: Judges should select sanctions that are tailored to the harm caused by the misuse of the discovery process and should not exceed what is required to protect the party harmed by that misuse. (Citation.) The discovery statutes indicate that judges should generally take an incremental approach to imposing sanctions for discovery abuses, starting with monetary sanctions and ending with the ultimate sanction of termination. (Citation.) If a lesser sanction fails to curb a party's misuse of the discovery process, then the imposition of a greater sanction is warranted; continuing abuses of that process warrant incrementally harsher sanctions until a sanction is reached that curbs the abuse. (Citation.)  “Imposing a terminating sanction. Although a decision to order a terminating sanction should not be made lightly, a judge is justified in imposing this ultimate sanction for a party's willful violation that has been preceded by a history of abuse, when the evidence shows that less severe sanctions would not produce compliance with the discovery rules. (Citations.)

(Cal. Judges Benchbook Civ. Proc. Discovery ; 6.5 Selecting Appropriate Sanction. Emphasis added.)

            While the Court agrees with the defendants that there is a significant history of delay by Plaintiff in responding to the multiple discovery requests propounded by the defendants, the Court cannot find that Plaintiff’s partial late compliance with the Court’s stipulated order warrants the Court’s imposition of the ultimate sanction of termination.



Case Number: ****2013    Hearing Date: July 21, 2020    Dept: O

Case Name: Smith v. McLucas, et al.
Case No.: ****2013 Complaint Filed: 6-25-18
Hearing Date: 7-21-20
Calendar No.: 9
POS: OK Trial Date: 8-16-21
SUBJECT: (7)  DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 
MOVING PARTY: (1)  Defendant Christos Kalatzis, MD
(2)  Defendant Ronald Lang, MD
(3)  Defendant Olympia Health Care LLC d/b/a Olympic Medical Center
(4)  Defendant Alecto Health Care Services Los Angeles LLC
(5)  Defendant Michael Daignault, MD
(6)  Defendant Jay Soffer, MD
(7)  Defendant Bruce B. McLucas, MD
RESP. PARTY: (1)-(7)  Plaintiff Nailah Smith
TENTATIVE RULING
Defendant Kalatzis’ Demurrer to the 1st cause of action for IIED, 2nd cause of action for battery, 5th cause of action for concealment and 6th cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty is SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.
Defendant Lang’s Demurrer to the 1st cause of action for IIED, 5th cause of action for concealment and 6th cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty is SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.  
Defendant Olympia Health Care LLC, et al.’s Demurrer to the 1st cause of action for IIED, 2nd cause of action for battery, 5th cause of action for concealment and 6th cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty is SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.
Defendant Alecto Health Care Services Los Angeles LLC, et al.’s Demurrer to the 1st cause of action for IIED, 2nd cause of action for battery, 5th cause of action for concealment and 6th cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty is SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.
Defendant Michael Daignault’s Demurrer to the 1st cause of action for IIED, 2nd cause of action for battery, 5th cause of action for concealment and 6th cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty is SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.
Defendant Jay Soffer, MD, et al.’s Demurrer to the 1st cause of action for IIED, 2nd cause of action for battery, 5th cause of action for concealment and 6th cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty is SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.
Defendant Bruce McLucas, MD, et al.’s Demurrer to the 1st cause of action for IIED, 2nd cause of action for battery, 5th cause of action for concealment and 6th cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty is SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.
In the opposition, Plaintiff fails to show there is any reasonable possibility of curing the defects raised by these demurrers if given leave to amend.  Plaintiff has the burden of doing so as the party seeking leave.  See Hendy v. Losse (1991) 54 Cal.3d 723, 742.    
1st cause of action for IIED—SUSTAIN WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND
The elements of a cause of action for intentional infliction of emotional distress are (1) outrageous conduct by the defendant, (2) intention to cause or reckless disregard of the probability of causing emotional distress, (3) severe emotional suffering, and (4) actual and proximate causation of the emotional distress.  “Conduct is extreme and outrageous when it exceeds all bounds of decency usually tolerated by a decent society, and is of a nature which is especially calculated to cause, and does cause, mental distress.  Liability does not extend to mere insults, indignities, threats, annoyances, petty oppressions, or other trivialities.” Fisher v. San Pedro Peninsula Hospital (1989) 214 Cal.App.3d 590, 618.  
“In order to meet the first requirement of the tort, the alleged conduct must be so extreme as to exceed all bounds of that usually tolerated in a civilized community.  Generally, conduct will be found to be actionable where the recitation of the facts to an average member of the community would arouse his resentment against the actor, and lead him to exclaim, ‘Outrageous!’”  Berkley v. Dowds (2007) 152 Cal.App.4th 518, 533–534 (physician’s encouragement of plaintiff to terminate husband’s life support did not rise to outrageous conduct where nothing more was alleged and plaintiff did not allege physician’s prognosis was incorrect or false).  
“Whether a defendant's conduct can reasonably be found to be outrageous is a question of law that must initially be determined by the court; if reasonable persons may differ, it is for the jury to determine whether the conduct was, in fact, outrageous.”  Id. at 534.  
Plaintiff is not alleging intentional conduct undertaken with the intent to cause emotional distress.  Plaintiff is claiming reckless disregard of the probability of emotional distress.  Plaintiff alleges that Defendants knew that emotional distress would probably result from their conduct.  See Complaint, ¶26.  Defendants’ knowledge is itself an ultimate fact.  See 5 Witkin, Cal. Proc. (5th ed. 2008), Plead ;728 (“Intent, like knowledge, is a fact).  Such an allegation is sufficient to plead “reckless disregard” under CACI 1603.  
However, Plaintiff fails to allege facts that would remove what transpired from ordinary malpractice to the realm of “outrageous conduct” outside that usually tolerated in a civilized community.  Based on Plaintiff’s allegations, Defendants prescribed medication that were contraindicated by her condition and failed to provide the proper specialists and treatments ordinarily required by a patient who has one kidney.  See Complaint, ¶¶6-14.  This merely alleges medical malpractice, not outrageous conduct.  
Moreover, Plaintiff fails to plead specific facts establishing severe emotional distress.  Plaintiff merely alleges that she has suffered “medical expenses, loss of earnings, anxiety, worry, anger, mental and emotional distress.”  See Complaint, ¶85.  Plaintiff must set forth facts indicating the “nature and extent of any mental suffering incurred” due to Defendants’ conduct.   See Bogard v. Employers Casualty Co. (1985) 164 Cal.App.3d 602, 617-618.
2nd cause of action for battery—SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND
To establish a medical battery claim, plaintiff must prove all of the following: 1. defendant performed a medical procedure without plaintiff's consent; or plaintiff consented to one medical procedure, but defendant performed a substantially different medical procedure; 2. That plaintiff was harmed; and 3. That defendant's conduct was a substantial factor in causing plaintiff's harm.  See CACI 530A.  A patient can consent to a medical procedure by words or conduct.  Id.  
“The battery theory should be reserved for those circumstances when a doctor performs an operation to which the patient has not consented. When the patient gives permission to perform one type of treatment and the doctor performs another, the requisite element of deliberate intent to deviate from the consent given is present.  However, when the patient consents to certain treatment and the doctor performs that treatment but an undisclosed inherent complication with a low probability occurs, no intentional deviation from the consent given appears; rather, the doctor in obtaining consent may have failed to meet his due care duty to disclose pertinent information. In that situation the action should be pleaded in negligence.”  Cobb v. Grant (1971) 8 Cal.3d 229, 240; see Kaplan v. Mamelak (2008) 162 Cal.App.4th 637, 646-647)(consent form signed by plaintiff only agreed to surgery on disk T8-9 of spine and defendant performed surgery on T6-7 and T7-8; finder of fact had to determine whether surgery on an incorrect disk is a reasonable risk of surgery performed on plaintiff or if it qualified as entirely different procedure); Ashcraft v. King (1991) 228 Cal.App.3d 604, 611 (motion for nonsuite of medical battery claim erroneously granted where evidence at trial established that patient only agreed to blood transfusions from family members and physician transfused nonfamily member blood, in violation of patient’s consent and unwittingly infecting him with HIV).  
In Freedman, the defendant physician told plaintiff to accept administration of the drug Pitocin, but defendants allegedly failed to disclose the material risk of the procedure or the properties Pitocin.  Freedman, supra, 214 Cal.App.3d at 736-737.  The defendant physician also allegedly misrepresented to the plaintiff that the Pitocin was required to prevent infection, when it was not.  Id. at 737.  The Court of Appeals affirmed the trial court’s order sustaining demurrer to the battery cause of action without leave to amend.  The Court explained that, while plaintiff’s consent was obtained through fraud, the administration of Pitocin was still for a therapeutic purpose and the mere fact that plaintiff was not informed of all of its properties or the fact that the drug was allegedly contraindicated for her condition, did not vitiate her consent.  “To vitiate consent the mistake must extend to the essential character of the act itself, which is to say that which makes it harmful or offensive, rather than to some collateral matter which merely operates as an inducement.”  Freedman v. Superior Court (1989) 214 Cal.App.3d 734, 738; cf. Ashcraft, supra, 228 Cal.App.3d at 611 (motion for nonsuit erroneously granted where evidence established plaintiff condition her consent to surgery on use of family-donated blood; surgeon committed battery if patient's consent to operation was conditioned on use of only family-donated blood, surgeon intentionally violated condition, and patient was harmed and whether these elements were established was jury question).  
“It is not alleged, however, that the purpose of the physicians was other than the rendition of therapeutic treatment. Nor is it contended that the deception by the physicians was for any independent or improper motive on their part.  [Plaintiff] argues that she has alleged the use of Pitocin in her case to be contraindicated, i.e., to be an erroneous prescription. Therefore, she says, the treatment cannot be deemed ‘therapeutic.’  We disagree. In our view the use of a drug or treatment which is accepted, generally, by the profession, does not become a nontherapeutic use because the physician prescribes it at the wrong point in the treatment process. We believe the term “therapeutic” is used in these cases to distinguish drugs or treatments which are intended to affect treatment and cure, as distinguished from applications which do not have that objective. That the intent was misguided or the utilization of the particular therapy inappropriate does not detract from the characterization of the application as ‘therapeutic.’  Following the rationale of Rains, therefore, we are motivated to conclude that the plaintiff cannot sustain a cause of action for battery by virtue of the stated allegations. She was induced to accept a drug by deception, but the deception did not have to do with the mutual purpose of patient and physician, which was treatment. They both knew the ‘essential character’ of the treatment, and the deception by the physician as to the specific medical objective was a collateral matter not vitiating consent.”  Freedman v. Superior Court, supra, 214 Cal.App.3d at 739.  
Plaintiff alleges she submitted to treatment by Defendants for uterine fibroids and agreed to undergo surgery as recommended.  See Complaint, ¶6.  Her complaint is based on the failure to advise or inform her of the risks associated with the procedure and the medications to be administered in connection with the procedure as they related to her kidney, kidney function and the contraindication of the prescribed medications based on the fact that she only had one kidney.  See Complaint, ¶6.  Plaintiff specifically identifies Motrin and Toradol as medications prescribed to her in connection with the surgery that were contraindicated based on her kidney condition and that ultimately caused her renal failure.  Id. at ¶¶7-11.  
There are no allegations that her consent was obtained to one specific procedure or medication and an entirely different procedure or medication was administered to her.  Defendants allegedly performed the procedures to which she consented and administered drugs for the purpose of carrying out those procedures.  Plaintiff’s consent to both the procedures and drugs were obtained through mistake or failure to fully inform Plaintiff of the relevant risks to her particular condition. There are also no allegations per Ashcraft that (1) Plaintiff expressly conditioned her consent to the procedures and medications on the fact that they were not contraindicated for her kidney condition and (2) Defendants intentionally violated this condition by knowingly prescribing procedures and medications that were contraindicated due to Plaintiff’s kidney issue.  
Plaintiff fails to plead medical battery based on lack of consent.  At best, she has pled lack of informed consent that amounts to medical malpractice or medical malpractice based on failure to adhere to the standard of care in prescribing medication as indicated by her full medical condition.  Demurrer is SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND as to the 2nd cause of action for battery.  
5th cause of action for fraudulent concealment—SUSTAIN WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND
The elements of a cause of action for fraud based on concealment are: (1) the defendant must have concealed or suppressed a material fact, (2) the defendant must have been under a duty to disclose the fact to the plaintiff, (3) the defendant must have intentionally concealed or suppressed the fact with the intent to defraud the plaintiff, (4) the plaintiff must have been unaware of the fact and would not have acted as he did if he had known of the concealed or suppressed fact, and (5) as a result of the concealment or suppression of the fact, the plaintiff must have sustained damage.  See Marketing West, Inc. v. Sanyo Fisher (USA) Corp. (1992) 6 Cal.App.4th 603, 612-613; 5 Witkin, Summary (10th ed. 2005) Torts, ; 793.  
“Thus, a duty to disclose may arise from the relationship between…doctor and patient…  All of these relationships are created by transactions between parties from which a duty to disclose facts material to the transaction arises under certain circumstances.”  LiMandri v. Judkins (1997) 52 Cal.App.4th 326, 337.
Less specificity is required when pleading concealment.  See Committee on Children's Television, Inc. v. General Foods Corp. (1983) 35 Cal.3d 197, 216.  “[L]ess specificity is required of a complaint when it appears from the nature of the allegations that the defendant must necessarily possess full information concerning the facts of the controversy; even under the strict rules of common law pleading, one of the canons was that less particularity is required when the facts lie more in the knowledge of the opposite party.”  Tenet Healthsystem Desert, Inc. v. Blue Cross of California (2016) 245 Cal.App.4th 821, 838.  
Plaintiff fails to allege a cause of action for concealment against Defendants.  Plaintiff alleges that Defendants failed to “disclose the true nature of Plaintiff’s condition and conceal[ed] that Plaintiff had renal failure caused by them.”  See Complaint, ¶55.  Plaintiff fails to allege that Defendants knew Plaintiff had renal failure, that they caused it and they concealed these facts from Plaintiff.  In fact, Plaintiff’s factual allegations focus on Defendants’ failure to assess her for kidney failure, failure to provide her with care appropriate to her kidney condition and failure to take into account her kidney condition, despite her statements to Defendants that she only had one kidney.  See Complaint, ¶¶6-11, 54.  Plaintiff fails to allege (1) that Defendants knew that Plaintiff was suffering renal failure and that Defendants caused Plaintiff’s renal failure, (2) when Defendants knew and how Defendants knew, and (3) when and how Plaintiff discovered Defendants’ concealment.  Plaintiff therefore fails to allege concealment with specificity and the element of knowledge and intent to defraud.  
6th cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty—SUSTAIN WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND
“The doctor-patient relationship is a fiduciary one and as a consequence of the physician's ‘fiducial” obligations,’ the physician is prohibited from misrepresenting the nature of the patient's medical condition.”  Hahn v. Mirada (2007) 147 Cal.App.4th 740, 748.  A” fiduciary relationship exists between the patient and the physician. As a result, the physician has a duty to disclose fully and completely the nature and extent of injuries and any material concealment or misrepresentation will amount to fraud sufficient to entitle the party injured thereby to a cause of action. The duty of disclosure is fiduciary in nature because of the confidential patient-physician relationship, the duty of disclosure is measured by fiduciary standards (not limited by medical standards), and the physician subjects himself to liability should he withhold facts necessary to a total disclosure.”  Nelson v. Gaunt (1981) 
Plaintiff’s breach of fiduciary duty claim is based on the exact same facts as the concealment claim.  Plaintiff alleges Defendants breached their fiduciary duty to Plaintiff by failing to “disclose the true nature of Plaintiff’s condition; failing to disclose that contraindicated and toxic drugs were improperly provided to her and concealing her true condition.”  See Complaint, ¶61.  However, as stated in connection with the concealment claim, Plaintiff fails to allege that (1) Defendants knew Plaintiff was suffering from renal failure and knowingly concealed or failed to disclose this fact to Plaintiff, (2) Defendants prescribed these medications knowing they were contraindicated for Plaintiff’s kidney condition and concealed this knowledge from Plaintiff and (3) Defendants knew they caused Plaintiff’s renal failure and knowingly concealed this fact.  
 


Case Number: ****2013    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

NAILAH SMITH,

BRUCE B. MCLUCAS, ET AL.,

Case No.:  ****2013

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented. 

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE WEST DISTRICT, JUDGE H. JAY FORD III presiding in DEPT. WE-O of the SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.  

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference.  Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

UPON RECEIPT OF THIS NOTICE, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL GIVE NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF RECORD.

DATED: February 26, 2020 ___________________________