This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/11/2023 at 12:24:57 (UTC).

NAI CAPITAL INCORPORATION ET AL VS FOSTER TEPPER ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2017 NAI CAPITAL INCORPORATION filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against FOSTER TEPPER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4086

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KENNEDY KENFIELD

ZUGSMITH MICHAEL

ZUGSMITH RACHEL SUSAN

NAI CAPITAL INC.

NAI CAPITAL MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TEPPER FOSTER

TEPPER & TAKVORYAN

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

NAI CAPITAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LINZER KENNETH ALLEN ESQ.

LARSON STEPHEN G.

MCGARRIGLE PATRICK CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

SCHNEIDER STEPHANIE BERMAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/4/2019: Amended Complaint - FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

1/13/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE BANKRUPTCY AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

1/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

10/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/15/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

8/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

6/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

1/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

11/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

9/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE OSC RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY AND PROPOSED ORDER

8/11/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE OSC RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY AND PROPOSED ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/11/2021

8/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/11/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

6/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/11/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT)

1/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

10/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference re Bankruptcy and Trial Setting Conference; Filed by: Michael Zugsmith (Plaintiff); Rachel Susan Zugsmith (Plaintiff); As to: Kenfield Kennedy (Plaintiff); NAI CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff); NAI Capital Management, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/28/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 45 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/11/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Status Conference; Filed by: NAI CAPITAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Mel Red Recana 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-10 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketDocument:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended Complaint: Status Date changed from 11/27/2018 to 12/22/2017; Exact Name: First Amended Complaint; Name Extension: blank; As To Parties changed from TEPPER & TAKVORYAN (Defendant), FOSTER TEPPER (Defendant) to TEPPER & TAKVORYAN (Defendant), FOSTER TEPPER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketDocument:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 07/12/18 at 8:30 am Mel Red Recana

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Legal Malpractice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less