This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 22:12:18 (UTC).

NAFFE, PARICHEHR KOHANIM VS NAFFE, NAVID

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 NAFFE, PARICHEHR KOHANIM filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against NAFFE, NAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0251

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NAFFE PARICHEHR KOHANIM

Respondent

NAFFE NAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ENCINAS DONNA MICHELLE

Respondent Attorney

BARDAVID JULIO ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Income and Expense

5/17/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

5/17/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Ex Parte - Application - -Denied

5/17/2021: Ex Parte - Application - -Denied

Minute Order

5/17/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/26/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/26/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

2/3/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/3/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/3/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

2/3/2021: Minute Order

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

11/17/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/17/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted

11/17/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

1/13/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Substitution of Attorney

1/13/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/13/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

1/13/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

11/17/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (-Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Video Authorized - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Partly Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENCINAS DONNA MICHELLE