This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 07:18:05 (UTC).

NAEEM SEIRAFI, ET AL. VS LEDGER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 NAEEM SEIRAFI filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LEDGER TECHNOLOGIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0877

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEIRAFI NAEEM

Defendant

LEDGER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARKSON RYAN JACK

Defendant Attorney

MCDOWELL DAVID FRANK JR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW STATUS OF REMOVAL)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW STATUS OF REMOVAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 07/06/2021

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 07/06/2021

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

2/24/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

2/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

2/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

3/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 03/05/2021

3/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 03/05/2021

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

2/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/3/2021: Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 02/03/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 02/03/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

1/25/2021: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Proof of Service by Mail

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BAHAR SODAIFY REGARDING VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1780(D)

1/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BAHAR SODAIFY REGARDING VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1780(D)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Status of Removal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Status of Removal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Status of Removal) of 07/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Removal to Federal Court) of 03/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Ledger Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Ledger Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Ledger Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference) of 02/03/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Naeem Seirafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Naeem Seirafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Bahar Sodaify Regarding Venue Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 1780(d)); Filed by Naeem Seirafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Naeem Seirafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Naeem Seirafi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDOWELL, DAVID F